EP3850372 - ROBOTIC SAMPLE PREPARATION SYSTEM FOR DIAGNOSTIC TESTING WITH AUTOMATED POSITION LEARNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TESLUK, Christopher, John 2020 E. Pratt Street Baltimore, MD 21231 / US | 02 /
BAILEY, Kevin 17337 Troyer Rd. Monkton, MD 21111 / US | 03 /
WESLY, Matthew 781 Sheraton Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 04 /
MOORE, John 27 Haynes Rd Deerfield, NH 03037 / US | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19860073.6 | 10.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019US50315 | Priority number, date | US201862729531P | 11.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862729531 P | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020055801 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3850372 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/00, G01N35/04, B25J13/00, G05B19/402, G01N35/10 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
G01N35/1011 (EP,US);
G01N35/0099 (EP,US);
B25J13/089 (US);
B25J9/1612 (US);
B25J9/1664 (US);
G01N35/00732 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/29] | G01N35/00, G01N35/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | ROBOTISCHES PROBENVORBEREITUNGSSYSTEM FÜR DIAGNOSTISCHES TESTEN MIT AUTOMATISCHER POSITIONSERKENNUNG | [2021/29] | English: | ROBOTIC SAMPLE PREPARATION SYSTEM FOR DIAGNOSTIC TESTING WITH AUTOMATED POSITION LEARNING | [2021/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PRÉPARATION D'ÉCHANTILLON ROBOTIQUE POUR TEST DE DIAGNOSTIC AVEC APPRENTISSAGE DE POSITION AUTOMATISÉ | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 05.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2017033247 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]WO02100485 (CALYPSO MED TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al); | [A]JP2012240174 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [X]DE102015104587 (PI4_ROBOTICS GMBH [DE]); | [X]WO2017033247 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [X]US2018236669 (FUKUDA TAKUYA [JP], et al) | by applicant | WO2017033247 |