blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3849567

EP3849567 - ESTROGEN RECEPTOR TARGETING ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.09.2024
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.06.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.04.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.06.2021
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  21.03.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2025Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL, RS
published on 04.06.2025 [2025/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xavier University Of Louisiana
1 Drexel Drive
P.O. Box 68
Office 217-C
New Orleans, LA 70125 / US
[2024/27]
Former [2021/29]For all designated states
Xavier University Of Louisiana
1 Drexel Drive
Box 68
New Orleans, Louisiana 70125 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Guangdi
2411 Jay Street
New Orleans, LA 70122 / US
02 / MOTTAMAL, Madhusoodanan
1 Drexel Drive,
P.O. Box 68
Office 217-C
New Orleans, LA 70125 / US
03 / KANG, Borui
1 Drexel Drive,
P.O. Box 68
Office 217-C
New Orleans, LA 70125 / US
 [2024/44]
Former [2021/29]01 / WANG, Guangdi
2411 Jay Street
New Orleans, LA 70122 / US
02 / MOTTAMAL, Madhusoodanan
1 Drexel Drive, P.O. Box 68 Office 217-C
New Orleans, LA 70125 / US
03 / KANG, Borui
1 Drexel Drive, P.O. Box 68 Office 217-C
New Orleans, LA 70125 / US
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2024/44]Murgitroyd & Company
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2021/29]Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25-26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
Application number, filing date19860532.111.09.2019
[2021/29]
WO2019US50573
Priority number, dateUS201862730464P12.09.2018         Original published format: US 201862730464 P
[2021/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020055973
Date:19.03.2020
Language:EN
[2020/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3849567
Date:21.07.2021
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2021/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3849567
Date:30.10.2024
Language:EN
[2024/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.03.2020
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.08.2022
ClassificationIPC:C07F5/02, A61K33/22, A61P35/00
[2022/26]
CPC:
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,US); C07F5/025 (EP,CN); C07F5/04 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US)
Former IPC [2021/29]A61K33/22, C07F5/05, A61P35/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/29]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUF DEN ÖSTROGENREZEPTOR ABZIELENDE ANTAGONISTEN[2021/29]
English:ESTROGEN RECEPTOR TARGETING ANTAGONISTS[2021/29]
French:ANTAGONISTES CIBLANT LE RÉCEPTEUR DES OESTROGÈNES[2021/29]
Entry into regional phase07.04.2021National basic fee paid 
07.04.2021Search fee paid 
07.04.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
07.04.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.04.2021Examination requested  [2021/29]
27.03.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2024Fee for grant paid
23.09.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.09.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.09.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
25.09.2024Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.10.2024
BG30.10.2024
ES30.10.2024
FI30.10.2024
HR30.10.2024
LV30.10.2024
NL30.10.2024
PL30.10.2024
NO30.01.2025
RS30.01.2025
GR31.01.2025
IS28.02.2025
PT28.02.2025
[2025/23]
Former [2025/22]AT30.10.2024
BG30.10.2024
ES30.10.2024
FI30.10.2024
HR30.10.2024
LV30.10.2024
NL30.10.2024
NO30.01.2025
GR31.01.2025
IS28.02.2025
PT28.02.2025
Former [2025/21]BG30.10.2024
ES30.10.2024
FI30.10.2024
HR30.10.2024
NL30.10.2024
IS28.02.2025
PT28.02.2025
Documents cited:Search[Y]US8063249  (KUSHNER PETER [US], et al);
 [Y]WO2013134230  (XAVIER UNIVERSITY [US]);
 [Y]WO2016196342  (EISAI R&D MAN CO LTD [JP]);
International search[A]WO9206068  (UNIV TEXAS [US]);
 [A]WO0025767  (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al);
 [Y]WO2013134230  (XAVIER UNIVERSITY [US]);
 [Y]WO2016196342  (EISAI R&D MAN CO LTD [JP])
by applicantWO2013134230
 WO2016196342
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.