EP3850908 - HEATER ELEMENT INCORPORATING PRIMARY CONDUCTOR FOR USE IN A HIGH-SPEED OVEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De Luca Oven Technologies, LLC 1 Sansome Street Suite 3500 San Francisco, California 94104 / US | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE LUCA, Nicholas, P. c/o De Luca Oven Technologies, LLC 1 Sansome Street Suite 3500 San Francisco, California 94104 / US | 02 /
PERKINS, Andrew c/o De Luca Oven Technologies, LLC 1 Sansome Street Suite 3500 San Francisco, California 94104 / US | 03 /
MINARD, James c/o De Luca Oven Technologies, LLC 1 Sansome Street Suite 3500 San Francisco, California 94104 / US | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Leach, Sean Adam, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19860537.0 | 12.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019US50805 | Priority number, date | US201862730878P | 13.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862730878 P | US201862730893P | 13.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862730893 P | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020056131 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3850908 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/24 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
H05B3/24 (EP,US);
F24C7/043 (US);
H05B2203/002 (EP,US);
H05B2203/017 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/29] | H05B3/20, H05B1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Title | German: | HEIZERELEMENT MIT PRIMÄRLEITER ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITSOFEN | [2021/29] | English: | HEATER ELEMENT INCORPORATING PRIMARY CONDUCTOR FOR USE IN A HIGH-SPEED OVEN | [2021/29] | French: | ÉLÉMENT CHAUFFANT INCORPORANT UN CONDUCTEUR PRIMAIRE DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS UN FOUR RAPIDE | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 30.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1991935 (WILLIAM MELSOM SYDNEY) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4034206 (PENROD GLEN H) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 12 * * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 47 * * figures 1-3 *; | [YA]EP0286217 (EMI PLC THORN [GB]) [Y] 1,6 * abstract * * figures 1-3,6 *[A] 2-5,7-15; | [Y]US2007164015 (CARPINO RICHARD J II [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0037] * * figures 1-9 * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0062] *; | [YD]US8498526 (DE LUCA NICHOLAS P [US]) [YD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2018129416 (FELDMAN BENJAMIN F [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH08210654 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-23* See claims 1-4 and figures 1-7. *; | [Y]US2010065542 (DUBEY ASHISH [US]) [Y] 13 * See paragraphs [0052]-[0060] and figures 1-4. *; | [Y]EP2884818 (CENTI CT DE NANOTECNOLOGIA E MATERIAIS TECNICOS FUNCIONAIS E INTELIGENTES [PT]) [Y] 1-23 * See paragraph [0026]-[0027], [0036]-[0041] and figure 1. *; | [Y]US2016345591 (DE LUCA NICHOLAS P [US], et al) [Y] 1-23 * See paragraphs [0003], [0033]-[0067] and figures 2-8. *; | [Y]US2017181224 (DE LUCA NICHOLAS P [US]) [Y] 7 * See paragraphs [0002], [0057]-[0064] and figures 1-4. * |