EP3852627 - ENERGY CONVERSION MONITORING DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reveal Biosensors, Inc. 5512 Livorno Court San Jose, CA 94138 / US | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATCH, Guy, Meredith 5512 Livorno Court San Jose, CA 94138 / US | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 19861488.5 | 18.09.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019US51671 | Priority number, date | US201862732876P | 18.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862732876 P | US201916572106 | 16.09.2019 Original published format: US201916572106 | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020061157 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3852627 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/1455, A61B5/00, // A61M16/00, A61M21/00 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
A61M16/024 (EP);
A61B5/0261 (US);
A61B5/0075 (US);
A61B5/0205 (US);
A61B5/0826 (US);
A61B5/1116 (US);
A61B5/14552 (EP);
A61B5/412 (EP,US);
A61B5/443 (US);
A61B5/4809 (US);
A61B5/4818 (EP,US);
A61B5/4836 (US);
A61B5/6814 (US);
A61B5/6824 (EP);
A61M21/00 (US);
A61B2503/04 (US);
A61B2503/10 (US);
A61B2503/20 (US);
A61B2503/22 (US);
A61B2562/146 (EP);
A61B2562/16 (EP);
A61B5/022 (US);
A61B5/02416 (US);
A61B5/14551 (US);
A61M16/0051 (EP);
A61M16/0069 (EP);
A61M2016/0027 (EP);
A61M2021/0022 (EP,US);
A61M2021/0083 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3313 (EP);
A61M2205/3553 (EP);
A61M2205/3569 (EP);
A61M2205/3584 (EP);
A61M2205/3592 (EP);
A61M2205/505 (EP);
A61M2205/52 (EP);
A61M2205/8206 (EP);
A61M2205/8243 (EP);
A61M2209/088 (EP);
A61M2210/04 (EP);
A61M2230/40 (EP);
A61M2230/50 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61M2230/40, A61M2230/005 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/30] | A61B5/1455, A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENERGIEUMWANDLUNGSÜBERWACHUNG | [2021/30] | English: | ENERGY CONVERSION MONITORING DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS | [2021/30] | French: | DISPOSITIFS, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE SURVEILLANCE DE LA CONVERSION ÉNERGÉTIQUE | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 23.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015168235 (EVERYONE CARE TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]); | [A]WO2016199121 (CHRONISENSE MEDICAL LTD [IL]); | [XI]WO2017074915 (REVEAL BIOSENSORS INC [US]) | International search | [Y]US2014194793 (NAKATA ROBERT HARUO [US], et al) [Y] 21-33 * See paragraphs [0178], [0208]. *; | [A]US2015057511 (BASU AMAR SARBBASESH [US]) [A] 1-34 * See paragraphs [0036]-[0047] and figure 1. *; | [A]JP6099607B [A] 1-34* See paragraphs [0015]-[0023]. *; | [AX]US2017112422 (HATCH GUY MEREDITH [US]) [A] 6,7,12-20 * See paragraphs [0023]-[0026], [0052]-[0089] and claims 1, 3, 26. * [X] 1-5,8-11,34; | [A]WO2018136501 (SOMNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-34 * See paragraphs [0052]-[0061]. * | by applicant | WO2017074915 |