EP3855164 - FLOCCULATION STATE MONITORING SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kurita Water Industries Ltd. 10-1 Nakano 4-chome Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-0001 / JP | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAO, Nobuaki c/o KURITA WATER INDUSTRIES LTD., 0-1, Nakano 4-chome, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-0001 / JP | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Becker, Eberhard Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | Becker, Eberhard Becker & Kurig Partnerschaft Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19861749.0 | 09.08.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019JP31659 | Priority number, date | JP20180176276 | 20.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018176276 | [2021/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020059366 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3855164 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/15, G01N21/53, B01D21/32, B03D3/06, // G01N21/82 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
G01N21/15 (EP);
G01N21/53 (EP,KR);
G01N21/532 (US);
B01D21/32 (KR);
B03D3/06 (EP);
B08B5/02 (KR);
G01N15/06 (US);
G01N21/51 (US);
G01N15/075 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/30] | G01N21/53, B01D21/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | SENSOR ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DES FLOCKUNGSZUSTANDES | [2021/30] | English: | FLOCCULATION STATE MONITORING SENSOR | [2021/30] | French: | CAPTEUR DE SURVEILLANCE D'ÉTAT DE FLOCULATION | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2020 | Translation filed | 10.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 12.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2018110043 (KURITA WATER IND LTD [JP]) [I] 1,2* paragraphs [0002] , [0039] - [0052] - [0061] - [0066]; figures 3,4,6 * | International search | [A]JPH03251744 (TONEN CORP) [A] 1-5 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH06281565 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-5 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005274216 (KURITA WATER IND LTD) [A] 1-5 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005351819 (TORAI ENG KK, et al) [A] 1-5 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2007263856 (KURITA WATER IND LTD) [A] 1-5 * (Family: none) *; | [A]CN102213676 (NANLIANG PRESSURE CONTAINER TECHNOLOGY SHANGHAI CO LTD)[A] 1-5; | [A]JP2017037033 (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1-5 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2018096768 (KURITA WATER IND LTD) [A] 1-5 | by applicant | JP2002195947 | JP2018176276 |