EP3829513 - LIGHT WEIGHT SELF-CONTAINED ARTICULATING ASSEMBLY FOR BED FRAME MOUNTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ergomotion, Inc. 6790 Navigator Way Suite 100 Goleta, CA 93117 / US | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERMALOVICH, Joseph c/o Ergomotion, Inc. 6790 Navigator Way Goleta, CA 93117 / US | 02 /
TOWE, Brett, Anthony c/o Ergomotion, Inc. 6790 Navigator Way Goleta, CA 93117 / US | 03 /
HARDING, Benjamin, D. c/o Ergomotion, Inc. 6790 Navigator Way Goleta, CA 93117 / US | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Engstle, Verena Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 19862617.8 | 16.09.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019US51368 | Priority number, date | US201862732502P | 17.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862732502 P | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020060953 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3829513 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/015, A47C17/00, A47C19/12, A47C20/04, A47C20/08, A47C23/00 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
A61G7/015 (EP,KR,US);
A61G7/005 (KR);
A61G7/018 (EP,KR,US);
A61G2200/32 (KR);
A61G2203/70 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | A61G7/00, A47C17/00, A47C19/12, A47C20/04, A47C20/08, A47C23/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | LEICHTGEWICHTIGE IN SICH GESCHLOSSENE GELENKANORDNUNG FÜR BETTGESTELLMONTAGE | [2021/23] | English: | LIGHT WEIGHT SELF-CONTAINED ARTICULATING ASSEMBLY FOR BED FRAME MOUNTING | [2021/23] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ARTICULATION AUTONOME LÉGER POUR MONTAGE DE CADRE DE LIT | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 02.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006143827 (WILMING MICHAEL [DE], et al); | [XAI]US2014250599 (CASSELL SAMANTHA L [US], et al); | [IA]CN107928234 (LI JIE) | International search | [A]US5579550 (BATHRICK LEELAND M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]US6101647 (STROUD DAVID W [US], et al) [A] 1-15* entire document *; | [A]US2009094748 (LONG THOMAS P [US]) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]US2009211028 (RICHMOND DARRELL A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]US2018110665 (TOTEMEIER HUNTER D [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * entire document * | by applicant | US2014250599 | US8910328 |