19.07.2024 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
26.04.2024 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.11.2023 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.09.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.08.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.05.2022 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
20.05.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
20.05.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
26.11.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
26.11.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
12.11.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.09.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
25.06.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
31.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.04.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
19.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.03.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
20.06.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
28.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.03.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|