EP3854071 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR STABILIZING VIDEOS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GoPro, Inc. 3025 Clearview Way San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOUADY, Cesar 3000 Clearview Way San Mateo, California 94402 / US | 02 /
DERBANNE, Thomas 3000 Clearview Way San Mateo, California 94402 / US | 03 /
KARPUSHIN, Maxim 3000 Clearview Way San Mateo, California 94402 / US | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Paustian & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19863228.3 | 27.08.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019US48368 | Priority number, date | US201862733237P | 19.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862733237 P | US201916391705 | 23.04.2019 Original published format: US201916391705 | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020060731 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3854071 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.03.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N23/68, G06T3/00 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
H04N23/683 (EP,US);
H04N23/685 (US);
H04N23/51 (US);
H04N23/54 (US);
H04N23/55 (US);
H04N23/631 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/23] | H04N5/232, G06T3/00 | ||
Former IPC [2021/30] | H04N5/351, H04N5/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR STABILISIERUNG VON VIDEOS | [2021/30] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR STABILIZING VIDEOS | [2021/30] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE STABILISATION DE VIDÉOS | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 28.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4959725 (MANDLE GARY [US]); | [A]KR100777457B ; | [XI]US2013141600 (PROCA ADRIAN [US], et al); | [A]EP2805482 (GOOGLE INC [US]); | [I]US2017332018 (BELL STEVEN [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2013002813 (VAUGHT BENJAMIN I [US], et al); | [A]US2017041545 (MURGIA CARLO [US], et al); | [A]US2017142337 (KOKARAM ANIL CHRISTOPHER [US], et al); | [A]US2018048821 (SEGAPELLI LOIC [US]); | [A]US2018220073 (KEAL WILLIAM KERRY [US]) |