EP3856956 - HYDROGEN FUELING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEWINSKI, Krzysztof A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
SUN, Fuxia 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
HAUG, Andrew T. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
ABULU, John E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
LUOPA, Sean M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
MOLNAR, Attila 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
BEDOYA, Cedric 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 19864240.7 | 20.09.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019IB58000 | Priority number, date | US201862738100P | 28.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862738100 P | [2021/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020065482 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3856956 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C25B15/02, C25B1/04, C25B9/23, C25B11/095, B60K15/03, C25B13/04, C25B9/73 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
B60K15/03 (EP);
B60K15/03006 (EP,US);
C25B1/04 (EP,US);
C25B11/055 (US);
C25B11/081 (US);
C25B11/095 (EP);
C25B13/04 (EP);
C25B15/02 (EP);
C25B9/23 (EP,US);
C25B9/73 (EP);
F17C5/06 (US);
B60K2015/03019 (EP,US);
B60K2015/03315 (EP,US);
F17C2221/012 (US);
F17C2270/0139 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/31] | C25B15/02, C25B1/10, C25B9/10, C25B11/04, F17C5/06, B60K15/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | WASSERSTOFFBETANKUNGSSYSTEM | [2021/31] | English: | HYDROGEN FUELING SYSTEM | [2021/31] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RAVITAILLEMENT EN HYDROGÈNE | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 12.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2008135403 (JANG BOR Z [US], et al) [Y] 12-14 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 13] , [0 42] , [0 21]; figures 1-3; claims 1-19 * * paragraphs [0055] - [0061] * [A] 15; | [A]US2011168549 (ROUSTAEI ALEX HR [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0365] - paragraph [0378]; figure 1 ** paragraph [0344] - paragraph [0352] *; | [YA]US2015001091 (BLANCHET SCOTT [US]) [Y] 12-14 * paragraphs [0030] - [0037]; figures 1, 4; claim 28 * [A] 15; | [Y]EP3222752 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 12,14 * paragraphs [0011] - [0014] - [0 31] - [0041] - [0 52] - [0053]; figures 1-2; claims 1-18 *; | [Y]WO2018118875 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 12-14 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 62] , [0 43]; claims 1-5 * * paragraphs [0033] - [0040] * | International search | [A]US7517604 (HAMROCK STEVEN J [US], et al) [A] 1-15; | [Y]US2010230190 (LUNG JEN-SHENG [TW]) [Y] 1-15; | [Y]US9231267 (MCALISTER ROY E [US]) [Y] 10,12-15; | [A]US9644277 (MACKINNON SEAN MICHAEL [CA], et al)[A] 1-15; | [Y]EP3222752 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 1-15 | by applicant | US5879828 | US5879827 | US6004494 | US6136412 | US6238534 | US7348088 | US2008135403 | US2011168549 | US2011262828 | US2014246304 | US2015001091 | US2015311536 | WO2016191057 | EP3222752 | US2017294669 | WO2018052145 | WO2018118875 |