EP3754541 - FACE DETECTION METHOD AND DEVICE, SERVICE PROCESSING METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
Former [2020/52] | For all designated states TENCENT TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) COMPANY LIMITED 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Kesong 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road, Midwest District of Hi-tech park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/52] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19864907.1 | 26.09.2019 | [2020/52] | WO2019CN108145 | Priority number, date | CN201811165758 | 30.09.2018 Original published format: CN201811165758 | [2020/52] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020063744 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3754541 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/62 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
G06V10/32 (EP,US);
G06V40/161 (CN);
G06F18/214 (US);
G06F18/2413 (CN,US);
G06V10/754 (EP,US);
G06V10/774 (EP,US);
G06V10/776 (EP,US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V40/165 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Title | German: | GESICHTSERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, DIENSTVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄT UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2020/52] | English: | FACE DETECTION METHOD AND DEVICE, SERVICE PROCESSING METHOD, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2020/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE VISAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SERVICE, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS | [2020/52] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2020 | Translation filed | 15.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 12.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US8165354 (ZHAO MING [US]) [A] 1,2,4-15* the whole document *; | [XA] - FENG TANG ET AL, "Probabilistic Hierarchical Face Model for Feature Localization", APPLICATIONS OF COMPUTER VISION, 2007. WACV '07. IEEE WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PI, (20070201), ISBN 978-0-7695-2794-9, pages 53 - 53, XP031055162 [X] 1,13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [03.1]; figure 4 * [A] 2,4-12 |