EP3860073 - TRANSMISSION PROCESSING METHOD, TERMINAL AND CONTROL NODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIVO MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO., LTD. 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JI, Zichao 283, BBK Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
PAN, Xueming 283, BBK Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Conti, Marco Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 19865127.5 | 23.08.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019CN102212 | Priority number, date | CN201811143433 | 28.09.2018 Original published format: CN201811143433 | [2021/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020063222 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3860073 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02, H04W76/23, H04L69/18, H04W28/02, H04L5/00, H04L41/0894, H04L41/22, H04L43/0852, H04W40/16, H04W40/22, H04L67/61, // H04W88/06, H04W92/18, H04W52/24, H04W52/38, H04W4/40, H04W74/08, H04L41/0853 | [2024/40] | CPC: |
H04W28/0236 (EP);
H04W72/53 (KR);
H04W28/0294 (CN,US);
H04L41/0894 (EP);
H04L41/22 (EP);
H04L43/0858 (EP);
H04L47/24 (CN);
H04L67/61 (EP);
H04L69/18 (EP);
H04W28/0268 (EP);
H04W52/18 (CN);
H04W52/26 (US);
H04W52/281 (CN,KR,US);
H04W52/50 (CN,KR);
H04W72/02 (EP);
H04W72/543 (EP,KR);
H04W72/56 (EP,KR);
H04W74/0825 (US);
H04W76/23 (EP);
H04W88/06 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W92/10 (KR);
H04W92/18 (EP,KR);
H04L41/0853 (EP);
H04L67/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/12] | H04W72/02, H04W76/23, H04L69/18, H04W28/02, H04L5/00, H04L41/0894, H04L41/22, H04L43/0852, H04W40/16, H04W40/22, // H04W88/06, H04W92/18, H04W52/24, H04W52/38, H04W4/40, H04W74/08, H04L41/0853 | ||
Former IPC [2024/06] | H04W72/02, H04W76/23, H04L69/18, H04W28/02, H04L5/00, H04L41/0894, H04L41/22, H04L43/0852, H04W40/16, H04W40/22, // H04W88/06, H04W92/18, H04W52/24, H04W52/38, H04W4/40, H04W74/08 | ||
Former IPC [2021/49] | H04W72/02, H04W76/23, H04W28/02, H04L5/00, H04L29/06, // H04W88/06, H04W92/18, H04W52/24, H04W52/38, H04W4/40, H04W74/08 | ||
Former IPC [2021/31] | H04L29/06, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄT UND STEUERKNOTEN | [2021/31] | English: | TRANSMISSION PROCESSING METHOD, TERMINAL AND CONTROL NODE | [2021/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE TRANSMISSION, TERMINAL, ET NOEUD DE CONTRÔLE | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2021 | Translation filed | 15.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 01.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2018167820 (BELLESCHI MARCO [SE], et al); | [X]US2018206260 (KHORYAEV ALEXEY [RU], et al); |