EP3859856 - LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKANO, Tetsuyuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
NISHINO, Hajime c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 19865455.0 | 25.07.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019JP29132 | Priority number, date | JP20180185014 | 28.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018185014 | [2021/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020066254 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3859856 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/052, H01M4/131, H01M4/134, H01M10/0568, H01M10/058, H01M10/0565, H01M10/0566, H01M50/474, H01M50/477, H01M50/409 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
H01M10/0566 (EP,US);
H01M4/131 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
H01M10/0568 (EP);
H01M10/058 (EP,US);
H01M4/0445 (EP);
H01M4/134 (US);
H01M50/474 (EP);
H01M50/477 (EP);
H01M50/489 (EP,US);
H01M10/0565 (EP,US);
H01M50/409 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/31] | H01M10/052, H01M2/16, H01M4/131, H01M4/134, H01M10/0568, H01M10/058, H01M10/0565 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2021/31] | English: | LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY | [2021/31] | French: | BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2021 | Translation filed | 16.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 26.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPH1012279 (DENSO CORP) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraphs [0021] - [0026]; figures 2,3 * [Y] 8 [I] 1-8; | [XYI]JP2013054972 (SONY CORP) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0021] - [0036] - [0119] , [0145]; figures 1-5 * [Y] 8 [I] 1-8; | [XYI]US2014186686 (TAKAHASHI MINORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0009] - [0046] - [0076] - [0087]; figure 1A * [Y] 8 [I] 1-8; | [Y] - JURNG SUNHYUNG ET AL, "Effect of electrolyte on the nanostructure of the solid electrolyte interphase (SEI) and performance of lithium metal anodes", ENERGY & ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE, Cambridge, vol. 11, no. 9, doi:10.1039/C8EE00364E, ISSN 1754-5692, (20180703), pages 2600 - 2608, URL: http://pubs.rsc.org/en/content/articlepdf/2018/EE/C8EE00364E, (20211004), XP055846891 [Y] 8 * Sections 1 and 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C8EE00364E | International search | [Y]JPS59181587U [Y] 1-5, 8 * , *; | [Y]JPH1012279 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1-8 * , *; | [Y]JP2016018772 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 1-8 * , *; | [Y]JP2016139610 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) [Y] 8* , * | by applicant | JPH1012279 |