EP3856753 - DISULFIDE-LINKED REVERSIBLE TERMINATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centrillion Technology Holdings Corporation Maples Corporate Services Limited P.O. Box 309 Ugland House Grand Cayman, KY1-1104 / KY | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAIN, Moti c/o Centrillion Technologies, Inc. 2500 Faber Place Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 02 /
ZHOU, Wei c/o Centrillion Technologies, Inc. 2500 Faber Place Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/31] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19865827.0 | 27.09.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019US53629 | Priority number, date | US201862738627P | 28.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862738627 P | US201962808413P | 21.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962808413 P | US201962835007P | 17.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962835007 P | US201962847458P | 14.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962847458 P | [2021/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020069424 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3856753 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/10, C07H19/20, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/6876 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
C07H19/10 (EP,US);
C07H19/20 (EP);
C12Q1/6869 (US);
C07H19/14 (US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2523/107, C12Q2525/186 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/31] | C07H19/00, C07H19/06, C07H19/073, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/6876 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | DISULFIDVERNETZTE REVERSIBLE TERMINATOREN | [2021/31] | English: | DISULFIDE-LINKED REVERSIBLE TERMINATORS | [2021/31] | French: | TERMINATEURS RÉVERSIBLES À LIAISON DISULFURE | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 07.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 16.08.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 16.08.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.08.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 16.08.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 16.08.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.08.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007166705 (MILTON JOHN [GB], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-10,12-15 * abstract * * claim - *; | [Y]WO2016182984 (CENTRILLION TECH HOLDINGS CORP, et al) [Y] 1,2,4-10,12-15 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2017058953 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-10,12-15 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2017079498 (INTELLIGENT BIOSYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-10,12-15 * abstract * * In particular claims 1, 8-25 and 39 *; | [Y]WO2017176677 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-10,12-15 * abstract * * In particular Claim 10 *; | [A] - TURCATTI G ET AL, "A new class of cleavable fluorescent nucleotides:synthesis and optimization as reversible terminatorsfor DNA sequencing by synthesis", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, GB, vol. 36, no. 4, doi:10.1093/NAR/GKN021, ISSN 0305-1048, (20080301), pages E25 - 1, (20080207), XP002570314 [A] 1,2,4-10,12-15 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/NAR/GKN021 | [A] - DIANA C. KNAPP ET AL, "Fluoride-Cleavable, Fluorescently Labelled Reversible Terminators: Synthesis and Use in Primer Extension", CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, DE, (20110203), vol. 17, no. 10, doi:10.1002/chem.201001952, ISSN 0947-6539, pages 2903 - 2915, XP055431478 [A] 1,2,4-10,12-15 * abstract * * Scheme 1; Page 2904 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.201001952 | International search | [A]US2003104437 (BARNES COLIN [GB], et al) [A] 1, 2, 6-9, 11* entire document *; | [A]US2007166705 (MILTON JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 1, 2, 6-9, 11 * entire document *; | [A]US2016355541 (JAIN MOTI [US], et al) [A] 1, 2, 6-9, 11 * entire document * | by applicant | US3817837 | US3850752 | US3939350 | US3996345 | US4275149 | US4277437 | US4366241 | US4971903 | WO9321340 | US5302509 | US5547839 | US5763594 | US5808045 | US5872244 | US5939292 | US6210891 | WO0123411 | US6214987 | US6232465 | US6258568 | US2003215862 | WO2005024010 | US2005130173 | US2006134633 | WO2006120433 | US2007166705 | EP1974057 | US2009127589 | US7932034 | US8262900 | US8399188 | WO2016182984 | WO2017058952 | WO2017079498 | WO2017176677 | - TURCATTI et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (20080000), vol. 36, page e25 | - KNAPP et al., Chem. Eur. J, (20110000), vol. 17, pages 2903 - 2915 | - ANSORGEMETZKERPAREEK et al., "Sequencing technologies and genome sequencing", J. Appl., (20110000), vol. 52, no. 4, pages 413 - 435 | - NYREN et al., "Enzymatic method for continuous monitoring of inorganic pyrophosphate synthesis", Anal. Biochem., (19850000), vol. 151, doi:10.1016/0003-2697(85)90211-8, pages 504 - 509, XP024829646 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(85)90211-8 | - METZKER, MICHAEL A., "Sequencing technologies—the next generation", Nature Rev. Gen., (20100000), vol. 11, pages 31 - 46 | - ANSORGE, WILHELM J., "Next-generation DNA sequencing techniques", New Biotech., (20090000), vol. 25, no. 4, pages 195 - 203 | - RONAGHI, M., "Pyrosequencing sheds light on DNA sequencing", Genome Res., (20010000), vol. 11, no. 1, doi:10.1101/gr.11.1.3, pages 3 - 11, XP000980886 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.11.1.3 | - ESFANDYARPOUR et al., "Structural optimization for heat detection of DNA thermosequencing platform using finite element analysis", Biomicrofluidics, (20080000), vol. 2, no. 2, page 024102 | - FULLER et al., "The challenges of sequencing by synthesis", Nat. Biotech., (20090000), vol. 27, no. 11, doi:10.1038/nbt.1585, pages 1013 - 1023, XP055013694 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1585 | - METZKER et al., "Termination of DNA synthesis by novel 3'-modified deoxyribonucleoside triphosphates", Nucleic Acids Res., (19940000), vol. 22, pages 4259 - 4267 | - CANARD BSARFATI R., "DNA polymerase fluorescent substrates with reversible 3'-tags", Gene, (19940000), vol. 148, doi:10.1016/0378-1119(94)90226-7, pages 1 - 6, XP023787574 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(94)90226-7 | - CATON-WILLIAMS J et al., "Use of a Novel 5'-Regioselective Phosphitylating Reagent for One-Pot Synthesis of Nucleoside 5'-Triphosphates from Unprotected Nucleosides", Current Protocols in Nucleic Acid Chemistry, (20130000), pages 1 - 21 | - NAGATA S et al., "Improved method for the solid-phase synthesis of oligoribonucleotide 5'-triphosphates", Chem. Pharm. Bull., (20120000), vol. 60, no. 9, pages 1212 - 15 | - ABRAMOVA et al., "A facile and effective synthesis of dinucleotide 5' triphosphates", Bioorg. Med. Chem., (20070000), vol. 15, doi:10.1016/j.bmc.2007.07.002, pages 6549 - 6555, XP022213108 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2007.07.002 | - ABRAMOVA et al., "Synthesis of morpholine nucleoside triphosphates", Tet. Lett., (20040000), vol. 45, doi:10.1016/j.tetlet.2004.03.193, page 4361, XP004506361 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetlet.2004.03.193 | - LEBEDEV et al., "Preparation of oligodeoxyribonucleotide 5'-triphosphates using solid support approach", Nucleos. Nucleot. Nucleic. Acids, (20010000), vol. 20, doi:10.1081/NCN-100002565, page 1403, XP009081703 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1081/NCN-100002565 | - HAMEL et al., "Synthesis of deoxyguanosine polyphosphates and their interactions with the guanosine 5'-triphosphate requiring protein synthetic enzymes of Escherichia coli", Biochemistry, (19750000), vol. 14, no. 23, pages 5055 - 5060 | - "Chemical synthesis of nucleoside 5'-triphosphates", VAGHEFI M., Nucleoside Triphosphates and their Analogs, Taylor & Francis, (20050000), pages 1 - 22 | - BURGESS et al., "Synthesis of nucleoside triphosphates", Chem. Rev., (20000000), vol. 100, doi:10.1021/cr990045m, pages 2047 - 2059, XP002464530 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr990045m | - RUPAREL et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (20050000), vol. 102, pages 5932 - 5937 | - WELCH et al., Chem. Eur. J, (19990000), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 951 - 960 | - ZHU et al., Cytometry, (19970000), vol. 28, pages 206 - 211 | - PROBER et al., Science, (19870000), vol. 238, pages 336 - 341 | - CONNELL et al., BioTechniques, (19870000), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 342 - 384 | - ANSORGE et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19870000), vol. 15, no. 11, pages 4593 - 4602 | - SMITH et al., Nature, (19860000), vol. 321, page 674 | - PANCHUK et al., J. Hist. Cyto., (19990000), vol. 47, pages 1179 - 1188 | - YIN et al., Appl Environ Microbiol., (20030000), vol. 69, no. 7, page 3938 | - BABENDURE et al., Anal. Biochem., (20030000), vol. 314, no. 2, page 206 | - JANKOWIAK et al., Chem. Res. Toxicol., (20030000), vol. 16, no. 3, page 304 | - WILSON et al., Analyst, (20030000), vol. 128, no. 5, page 480 | - RODA et al., Luminescence, (20030000), vol. 18, no. 2, page 72 | - KITAYAMA et al., Photochem. Photobiol., (20030000), vol. 77, no. 3, page 333 | - MAEDA, J. Pharm. Biomed. Anal., (20030000), vol. 30, no. 6, page 1725 | - Tet. Letts., (20000000), vol. 46, pages 8867 - 8871 | - J. Amer. Chem. Soc., (20010000), vol. 123, pages 8101 - 8108 | - EMPODOCLES et al., Nature, (19990000), vol. 399, pages 126 - 130 | - REICHERT et al., Anal. Chem., (20000000), vol. 72, pages 6025 - 6029 | - LACOSTE et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (20000000), vol. 97, no. 17, pages 9461 - 9466 | - DOHM et al., "Substantial biases in ultra-short read data sets from high-throughput DNA sequencing", Nucleic Acids Res., (20080000), vol. 36, page e105 | - "Choosing Reporter-Quencher Pairs for Efficient Quenching Through Formation of Intramolecular Dimers", JOHANSEN, M. K., Fluorescent Energy Transfer Nucleic Acid Probes: Designs and Protocols, Humana Press Inc., vol. 335 | - SOUTHWORTH et al., "Cloning of thermostable DNA polymerase from hyperthermophilic marine Archaea with emphasis on Thermococcus species 9°N-7 and mutations affecting 3'-5' exonuclease activity", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19960000), vol. 93, no. 11, pages 5281 - 5285 | - GARDNER et al., "Acyclic and dideoxy terminator preferences denote divergent sugar recognition by archaeon and Taq DNA polymerases", Nucl. Acids Res., (20020000), vol. 30, pages 605 - 613, XP002309458 | - NISHIOKA et al., "Long and accurate PCR with a mixture of KOD DNA polymerase and its exonuclease deficient mutant enzyme", J. Biotech., (20010000), vol. 88, doi:10.1016/S0168-1656(01)00275-9, pages 141 - 149, XP002967585 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-1656(01)00275-9 | - TAKAGI et al., "Characterization of DNA polymerase from Pyrococcus sp. strain KOD1 and its application to PCR", App. Env. Microbiol., (19970000), vol. 63, no. 11, pages 4504 - 4510, XP002974648 | - TABOR et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19950000), vol. 92, pages 6339 - 6343 | - BURFIELD et al., "Desiccant Efficiency in Solvent Drying. A Reappraisal by Application of a Novel Method for Solvent Water Assay", J. Org. Chem., (19770000), vol. 42, no. 18, pages 3060 - 3065 | - ADDISON AULT, Techniques and Experiments for Organic Chemistry, University Science Books, (19980000), pages 45 - 59 | WO2007GB01770 |