12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
05.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
24.11.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] |
17.11.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.11.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.11.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.10.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.08.2023 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
05.07.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.04.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
21.04.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
20.07.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.05.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.12.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] |
03.12.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] |
12.10.2021 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
08.10.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
08.10.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
02.07.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
02.07.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
09.06.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.04.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.04.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.04.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
16.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.04.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.04.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|