EP3851909 - ELECTROCHROMIC DEVICE AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/29] | ELECTROCHROMIC DEVICE AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT | ||
[2022/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18, Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Xin No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19867045.7 | 17.07.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019CN96382 | Priority number, date | CN201811159209 | 30.09.2018 Original published format: CN201811159209 | [2021/29] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020063054 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3851909 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3851909 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/153 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
G02F1/153 (EP);
G02F1/1533 (CN);
G02F1/1525 (US);
G02F1/1508 (US);
G02F1/155 (CN,US);
G02F1/163 (CN);
G02F2001/1536 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHROME VORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/11] | English: | ELECTROCHROMIC DEVICE AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR | [2022/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROCHROMIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2022/11] |
Former [2021/29] | ELEKTROCHROME VORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT | ||
Former [2021/29] | ELECTROCHROMIC DEVICE AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT | ||
Former [2021/29] | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROCHROMIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, ET ÉQUIPEMENT ÉLECTRONIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2021 | Translation filed | 12.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 11.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.07.2019 | AL | 01.06.2022 | AT | 01.06.2022 | CY | 01.06.2022 | CZ | 01.06.2022 | DK | 01.06.2022 | EE | 01.06.2022 | ES | 01.06.2022 | FI | 01.06.2022 | HR | 01.06.2022 | IT | 01.06.2022 | LT | 01.06.2022 | LV | 01.06.2022 | MC | 01.06.2022 | MK | 01.06.2022 | NL | 01.06.2022 | PL | 01.06.2022 | RO | 01.06.2022 | RS | 01.06.2022 | SE | 01.06.2022 | SI | 01.06.2022 | SK | 01.06.2022 | SM | 01.06.2022 | IE | 17.07.2022 | LU | 17.07.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | CH | 31.07.2022 | LI | 31.07.2022 | BG | 01.09.2022 | NO | 01.09.2022 | GR | 02.09.2022 | IS | 01.10.2022 | PT | 03.10.2022 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CY | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
IT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
MK | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
IE | 17.07.2022 | ||
LU | 17.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CY | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
IT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
IE | 17.07.2022 | ||
LU | 17.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
IT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
IE | 17.07.2022 | ||
LU | 17.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
IE | 17.07.2022 | ||
LU | 17.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
LU | 17.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
LU | 17.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 01.06.2022 | |
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 01.06.2022 | |
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 01.06.2022 | |
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 01.06.2022 | |
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017108754 (ALI MOAZZAM [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0038] ** figures 2A,2B,3 *; | [A]CN108549182 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0050] * * figure 5 * | International search | [A]WO2010099147 (NTERA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]CN105573003 (HANNSTAR DISPLAY (NANJING) CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN106527810 (TRULY OPTO ELECTRONICS LTD ) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN107841776 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN107864581 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN207427625U (MEIZU TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN108177475 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [A] 1-20 * the abstract *; | [A]CN108198511 (TRULY OPTO ELECTRONICS LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN108519709 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN108541167 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * description, particularly figures 1, 4a, 4b and 7a-9, and corresponding parts of description *; | [A]CN108549185 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN108549182 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN108549184 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN108594557 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [PX]CN109116652 (OPPO GUANGDONG MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CO LTD) [PX] 1-20 * entire document * |