EP3700704 - ELECTRODE RE-CONDITIONING TOOL AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KTH Parts Industries, Inc. 1111 N St. Rt. 235 P.O. Box 0940 St. Paris, Ohio 43072-9040 / US | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GINDLESBERGER, Eric 1111 N St. Rt. 235 P.O. Box 0940 St. Paris, Ohio 43072-9040 / US | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Salomäki, Juha Kari Ensio Salomaki Oy Kankurinkatu 4-6 05800 Hyvinkää / FI | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 19867307.1 | 20.09.2019 | [2020/36] | WO2019US52094 | Priority number, date | US201862735565P | 24.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862735565 P | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020068575 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3700704 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23K11/11, B23K11/31, B23K11/36, B23K11/18, B23K11/30 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
B23K11/3063 (EP);
B23K11/36 (US);
B23K11/11 (US);
B23K11/115 (EP);
B23K11/185 (EP);
B23K11/3009 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/36] | B23K11/11, B23K11/31, B23K11/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENAUFBEREITUNGSWERKZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER VERWENDUNG | [2020/36] | English: | ELECTRODE RE-CONDITIONING TOOL AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME | [2020/36] | French: | OUTIL DE RECONDITIONNEMENT D'ÉLECTRODE ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2020/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 21.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US6342686 (FARROW JOHN F [US]) [Y] 2 & 3 * ; figure 3; column 6, lines 57-67; column 8, line 54 to column 9, line 4 *; | [XY]US2005211677 (CHEN YEN-LUNG [US]) [X] 1, 4-20 * ; figures 2-7; paragraphs [0019]-[0027], [0026]; claim 9 * [Y] 2 & 3; | [A]US2015083694 (SIGLER DAVID R [US], et al) [A] 1-20* ; entire document * |