EP3857227 - COMPOSITION FOR REMOVING HAPTEN INTERFERENCE FROM ASSAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/31] | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR REMOVING BIOTIN INTERFERENCE FROM ASSAYS USING CYCLODEXTRIN TRAPS | ||
[2023/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc. 511 Benedict Avenue Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Tie 97 Ascension Drive Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Schweitzer, Klaus Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 19868091.0 | 19.09.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019US51880 | Priority number, date | US201862735909P | 25.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862735909 P | [2021/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020068544 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3857227 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3857227 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N33/543 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
G01N33/5306 (EP,US);
C07K16/44 (US);
G01N1/34 (US);
G01N33/543 (EP,US);
G01N33/54313 (US);
G01N2400/18 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/31] | G01N33/543 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON HAPTEN-INTERFERENZ AUS ASSAYS | [2023/17] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR REMOVING HAPTEN INTERFERENCE FROM ASSAYS | [2023/17] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR ÉLIMINER L'INTERFÉRENCE D'HAPTÈNE DANS DES ESSAIS | [2023/17] |
Former [2021/31] | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON BIOTIN-INTERFERENZ AUS ASSAYS UNTER VERWENDUNG VON CYCLODEXTRINFALLEN | ||
Former [2021/31] | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR REMOVING BIOTIN INTERFERENCE FROM ASSAYS USING CYCLODEXTRIN TRAPS | ||
Former [2021/31] | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR ÉLIMINER L'INTERFÉRENCE DE LA BIOTINE DANS DES ESSAIS AU MOYEN DE PIÈGES À CYCLODEXTRINE | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 29.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | IT | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5212063 (OFENLOCH-HAEHNLE BEATUS [DE], et al) [Y] 4 * see col. 1-4, example 2 *; | [A]US5863740 (KIENTSCH-ENGEL ROSEMARIE [DE], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [XY]WO2014030002 (UNIV KENT CANTERBURY [GB]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10 * see p. 6-7, 11-12, Fig. 1 * [Y] 4; | [XY] - HOLZINGER MICHAEL ET AL, "Biotin-[beta]-Cyclodextrin: A New Host-Guest System for the Immobilization of Biomolecules", LANGMUIR, US, (20120816), vol. 28, no. 34, doi:10.1021/la301963v, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 12569 - 12574, XP055843312 [X] 1-3,5-10 * see abstract, p. 12569-12572, Fig. 6 * [Y] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la301963v | [X] - Flamigni Lucia, "Inclusion of Fluorescein and Halogenated Derivatives in a-, /?-, and 7-Cyclodextrins. A Steady-State and Picosecond Time-Resolved Study", J. Phys. Chem, (19930101), pages 9566 - 9572, URL: https://pubs.acs.org/doi/pdf/10.1021/j100140a006, (20210921), XP055843340 [X] 1,2,5-10 * see abstract * | [XY] - BEN AISSA A. ET AL, "Magnetic molecularly imprinted polymer for the isolation and detection of biotin and biotinylated biomolecules", BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, Amsterdam , NL, (20170201), vol. 88, doi:10.1016/j.bios.2016.07.096, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 101 - 108, XP055843332 [X] 1,2,5,7,10 * see Fig. 1, p. 102, 106-107 * [Y] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bios.2016.07.096 | International search | [Y]US4426292 (WERNICK DAVID L [US], et al) [Y] 1-2, 9-10, 3-8 * ; entire document, especially abstract, Figs 1-5, col 3 lines 50-55, col 5 lines 35-49 *; | [YD]US5212063 (OFENLOCH-HAEHNLE BEATUS [DE], et al) [YD] 1-2, 9-10, 3-8 * ; entire document, especially abstract, claim 7, claim 9, col 1 lines 25-49, col 3 lines 55-65, col 4 lines 32-39 *; | [A]US6231982 (WANG CHENGRONG [US]) [A] 1-10* ; entire document * | Examination | - Mathapa Baghali G. ET AL, "Fabrication of novel cyclodextrin-polyallylamine hydrochloride co-polymeric microcapsules by templating oil-in-water emulsions", Soft Matter, GB, (20130101), vol. 9, no. 19, doi:10.1039/c3sm27935a, ISSN 1744-683X, page 4780, XP055949911 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3sm27935a | by applicant | US5212063 | US5340716 | US8252605 | WO2014030002 | - M. HOLZINGER et al., "Biotin-P-Cyclodextrin: A New Host-Guest System for the Immobilization of Biomolecules", Langmuir, (20120000), vol. 28, doi:10.1021/la301963v, pages 12569 - 12574, XP055843312 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la301963v | - L. FLAMIGNI, "Inclusion of Fluorescein and Halogenated Derivatives, in α-, β-, and γ-Cyclodextrins", J. Phys. Chem., (19930000), vol. 97, pages 9566 - 9572, XP055843340 | - A. BEN AISSA et al., "Magnetic molecularly imprint polymer for the isolation and detection of biotin and biotinylated biomolecules", Biosensors and Bioelectronics, (20170000), vol. 88, doi:10.1016/j.bios.2016.07.096, pages 101 - 108, XP055843332 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bios.2016.07.096 | - B.G. MATHAPA et al., "Fabrication of novel cyclodextrin-polyallylamine hydrochloride co-polymeric microcapsules by templating oil-in-water emulsions", Soft Matter, (20130000), vol. 9, pages 4780 - 4788 |