EP3861685 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CRYPTOGRAPHIC AUTHENTICATION OF CONTACTLESS CARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Capital One Services, LLC 1680 Capital One Drive McLean, VA 22102 / US | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSBORN, Kevin 49 Hillside Road Newton Highlands, MA 02461 / US | 02 /
ASHFIELD, James 14106 Old Fort Drive Midlothian, VA 23113 / US | 03 /
RULE, Jeffrey 3906 Laird Place Chevy Chase, MD 20815 / US | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/32] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 19868289.0 | 01.10.2019 | [2021/32] | WO2019US53950 | Priority number, date | US201862740352P | 02.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862740352 P | US201816205119 | 29.11.2018 Original published format: US201816205119 | [2021/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020072413 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3861685 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04L12/26, H04L29/06 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
H04L9/0861 (EP,KR);
H04L9/3242 (EP,KR,US);
G06F21/34 (CN);
H04L9/3234 (EP,KR,US);
G06F21/35 (EP);
G06F21/46 (CN);
G06F21/602 (EP);
G06F21/606 (EP);
G06F21/6245 (EP);
G06F21/77 (EP);
G06K19/07309 (EP);
G06K7/10297 (EP);
G06Q10/087 (EP);
G06Q20/108 (EP);
G06Q20/12 (EP);
G06Q20/204 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q20/227 (EP);
G06Q20/32 (EP);
G06Q20/3226 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q20/3278 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q20/34 (EP);
G06Q20/352 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q20/354 (EP,KR);
G06Q20/3552 (EP);
G06Q20/3563 (EP);
G06Q20/36 (EP);
G06Q20/3674 (EP,KR);
G06Q20/382 (EP,KR);
G06Q20/3823 (EP);
G06Q20/3825 (EP);
G06Q20/3829 (EP,KR);
G06Q20/40 (US);
G06Q20/401 (EP);
G06Q20/4014 (EP);
G06Q20/409 (EP);
G06Q20/4097 (EP);
G06Q20/40975 (EP,KR);
G07F7/0893 (EP);
G07F7/122 (EP);
G07F9/001 (EP);
H04B5/24 (EP);
H04B5/43 (EP);
H04B5/77 (EP);
H04L63/0428 (EP);
H04L63/068 (EP);
H04L63/08 (EP);
H04L63/0807 (EP);
H04L63/0853 (EP,US);
H04L63/1441 (EP);
H04L9/002 (EP);
H04L9/0625 (EP);
H04L9/0631 (EP);
H04L9/0637 (EP);
H04L9/0643 (EP);
H04L9/0822 (EP);
H04L9/0825 (EP);
H04L9/0863 (EP);
H04L9/0866 (EP,US);
H04L9/0891 (EP);
H04L9/0897 (EP);
H04L9/14 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/3228 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/3271 (EP);
H04W12/041 (EP,KR);
H04W12/06 (KR);
H04W12/108 (EP);
H04W12/47 (EP);
H04W4/80 (EP,KR);
H04L2209/56 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR KRYPTOGRAPHISCHEN AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG VON KONTAKTLOSEN KARTEN | [2021/32] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CRYPTOGRAPHIC AUTHENTICATION OF CONTACTLESS CARDS | [2021/32] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'AUTHENTIFICATION CRYPTOGRAPHIQUE DE CARTES SANS CONTACT | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 19.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1139200 (TRADECARD INC [US]); | [I]US2007101152 (MERCREDI DWAYNE [US], et al); | [XI]US2009313687 (POPP NICOLAS [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2007250923 (M RAIHI DAVID [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US7506165 (KOCHER PAUL C [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US7584153 (BROWN KERRY D [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]WO2010049252 (GEMALTO SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2010313056 (MARGOLIS EVGENI [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US8838973 (YUNG MARCEL MORDECHAI MOTI [US], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]US2015067794 (BLAKELY ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2015134540 (LAW SIMON [CA], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2017154328 (ZARAKAS JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2017346850 (JIN JING [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]WO2018007828 (KALYPTON INTERNATIONAL LTD [GB]) [A] 1-20 * entire document * | by applicant | US2007101152 | US2009313687 |