EP3861737 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR CONSTRUCTING MERGE CANDIDATE LIST INCLUDING ADDING A NON- ADJACENT DIAGONAL SPATIAL MERGE CANDIDATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OP Solutions, LLC 368 Middle Street Amherst, MA 01002 / US | [2023/03] |
Former [2021/32] | For all designated states OP Solutions, LLC 31 Jackson Terrace Newton MA 02458 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALVA, Hari 777 Glades Road Boca Raton, Florida 33431 / US | 02 /
FURHT, Borivoje 777 Galdes Road Boca Raton, Florida 33431 / US | 03 /
ADZIC, Velibor 31 Jackson Terrace Newton, Massachusetts 02458 / US | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Best, Bastian Bestpatent Patentanwalt Bastian Best Konrad-Zuse-Platz 8 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/32] | Vossius, Corinna Corinna Vossius IP Group Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Buchenstrasse 17 82064 Straßlach-Dingharting / DE | Application number, filing date | 19868332.8 | 04.10.2019 | [2021/32] | WO2019US54816 | Priority number, date | US201862741639P | 05.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862741639 P | [2021/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020072969 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3861737 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/52, H04N19/593 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
H04N19/593 (EP);
H04N19/44 (US);
H04N19/105 (US);
H04N19/176 (US);
H04N19/1883 (US);
H04N19/52 (EP);
H04N19/96 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/32] | H04N19/44, H04N19/51, H04N19/52, H04N19/593 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR ERSTELLUNG EINER ZUSAMMENFÜHRUNGSKANDIDATENLISTE, DIE DAS HINZUFÜGEN EINES NICHT BENACHBARTEN DIAGONALEN RÄUMLICHEN ZUSAMMENFÜHRUNGSKANDIDATEN BEINHALTET | [2021/32] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR CONSTRUCTING MERGE CANDIDATE LIST INCLUDING ADDING A NON- ADJACENT DIAGONAL SPATIAL MERGE CANDIDATE | [2021/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES POUR CONSTRUIRE UNE LISTE DE CANDIDATS DE FUSION COMPRENANT L'AJOUT D'UN CANDIDAT DE FUSION SPATIAL DIAGONAL NON ADJACENT | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 31.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 20.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 20.03.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 20.03.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CA3039155 (KT CORP [KR]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0142] - [0151] - [ 160] - [0164] - [ 197] - [0200]; figures 2, 5, 17 *; | [X] - Y-W CHEN ET AL, "Description of SDR, HDR and 360° video coding technology proposal by Qualcomm and Technicolor "" low and high complexity versions", 10. JVET MEETING; 10-4-2018 - 20-4-2018; SAN DIEGO; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://PHENIX.INT-EVRY.FR/JVET/,, (20180414), no. JVET-J0021-v5, XP030151184 [X] 1-15 * sections 2.1, 2.8.2.1 * | [XI] - HAITAO YANG ET AL, "Description of Core Experiment 4 (CE4) Inter prediction and motion vector coding", no. JVET-K1024_v4; JVET-K1024, (20180710), pages 1 - 44, 11. JVET MEETING; 20180711 - 20180718; LJUBLJANA; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/11_Ljubljana/wg11/JVET-K1024-v4.zip JVET-K1024-v3_with_revision_marks.docx, (20180927), XP030193957 [X] 1,2 * sections 4.3.2, 4.3.3, 4.3.8.1, 4.3.10 * [I] 3-15 | International search | [XY]US2014294086 (OH SOO MI [KR], et al) [X] 1-3, 5, 7-9, 11-16, 18, 20-22, 24-26 * entire document * [Y] 4, 6, 10, 17, 19, 23; | [A]US9154790 (YIE CHUNG KU [KR], et al) [A] 1-26 * entire document *; | [A]US2016295240 (KIM TAESUP [KR], et al) [A] 1-26* entire document *; | [Y]WO2017197126 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [Y] 4, 6, 10, 17, 19, 23 * entire document * | by applicant | CA3039155 | - YI-W. CHEN et al., Description of SDR, HDR and 360° video coding technology proposal by Qualcomm and Technicolor | - HAITAO YANG et al., Description of Core Experiment 4 (CE4) Inter prediction and motion vector coding |