EP3860571 - TREATING ESSENTIAL TREMOR USING (R)-2-(4-ISOPROPYLPHENYL)-N-(1-(5-(2,2,2-TRIFLUOROETHOXY)PYRIDIN-2-YL)ETHYL)ACETAMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cavion, Inc. 600 East Water Street, Suite E Charlottesville, VA 22902 / US | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Margaret S. 20 Pleasant Street Middleton, Massachusetts 01949 / US | 02 /
PAPAPETROPOULOS, Spyridon 22 Skyline Drive Wellesley, Massachusetts 02482 / US | 03 /
HIGGIN, Michelle S. 5516 Solomon's Seal Court Holly Springs, North Carolina 27540 / US | 04 /
DUVVURI, Muralikrishna 104 Bristol Drive Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27516 / US | 05 /
REHLAENDER, Bruce N. 15100 Weston Parkway, Suite 101 Cary, North Carolina 27513 / US | 06 /
NEWBOLD, Evan 910 Rainier Road Charlottesville, Virginia 22903 / US | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2021/32] | Application number, filing date | 19868543.0 | 03.10.2019 | [2021/32] | WO2019US54498 | Priority number, date | US201862740755P | 03.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862740755 P | US201862780049P | 14.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862780049 P | [2021/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020072773 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3860571 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K9/16, A61K9/48 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
A61K9/1652 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K9/0053 (KR,US);
A61K31/4412 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/44 (US);
A61K9/0095 (KR);
A61K9/4808 (KR);
A61K9/4816 (KR);
A61K9/5026 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P25/08 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON ESSENTIELLEM TREMOR UNTER VERWENDUNG VON (R)-2-(4-ISOPROPYLPHENYL)-N-(1-(5-(2,2,2-TRIFLUORETHOXY)PYRIDIN-2-YL)ETHYL)ACETAMID | [2021/32] | English: | TREATING ESSENTIAL TREMOR USING (R)-2-(4-ISOPROPYLPHENYL)-N-(1-(5-(2,2,2-TRIFLUOROETHOXY)PYRIDIN-2-YL)ETHYL)ACETAMIDE | [2021/32] | French: | TRAITEMENT DES TREMBLEMENTS ESSENTIELS À L'AIDE DE (R)-2-(4-ISOPROPYLPHÉNYL)-N-(1-(5-(2,2,2-TRIFLUOROÉTHOXY)PYRIDIN-2-YL)ÉTHYL)ACÉTAMIDE | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 22.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016187718 (ODIDI ISA [CA]); | [A]WO2017070680 (CAVION LLC [US]); | [A]US2017189342 (NGUYEN JACK [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US2004198822 (FRASER MATTHEW OLIVER [US], et al); | [Y]US2010151022 (LENAERTS VINCENT [CA], et al); | [Y]US2014004186 (HUSTVEDT SVEIN OLAF [NO], et al); |