EP3860847 - MULTILAYER OPTICAL FILMS AND ARTICLES COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEBRINK, Timothy J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
MAKI, Stephen P. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
HOYLE, Charles D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
OXMAN, Joel D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
SCHOLZ, Matthew T. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
MAZZONI, Justin M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
GRIFFIN, Michael E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 08 /
HAMLIN, Anna C. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | [2021/32] | Application number, filing date | 19868588.5 | 25.09.2019 | [2021/32] | WO2019IB58145 | Priority number, date | US201862741886P | 05.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862741886 P | [2021/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020070589 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3860847 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/02, B32B27/32, G02B27/30, C08L27/18, G02B5/28, G02B5/20 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
G02B5/208 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B7/02 (EP);
C08K3/28 (US);
C08L23/08 (US);
C08L27/18 (EP,US);
G02B1/04 (US);
G02B1/115 (US);
G02B19/0095 (EP,US);
G02B5/283 (EP);
G02B5/287 (EP);
C08L2201/10 (US);
C08L2203/20 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/32] | B32B7/02, B32B27/32, G02B27/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE MEHRSCHICHTFOLIEN UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE GEGENSTÄNDE | [2021/32] | English: | MULTILAYER OPTICAL FILMS AND ARTICLES COMPRISING THE SAME | [2021/32] | French: | FILMS OPTIQUES MULTICOUCHES ET ARTICLES COMPRENANT CEUX-CI | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 23.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015219805 (SCHREIBER HORST [US], et al); | [XY]US2017368215 (SHATALOV MAXIM S [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US5540978 (SCHRENK WALTER J [US]); | [Y]US2002005986 (HEBRINK TIMOTHY J [US], et al); | [Y]US2011262754 (ZEHENTMAIER SEBASTIAN F [DE], et al); | [A]US8426778 (BOLT BRYAN [US]); | [A]US2017290934 (DOBRINSKY ALEXANDER [US], et al) | by applicant | US2015219805 | US2017368215 |