EP3851488 - TREAD RUBBER COMPOSITION AND PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMITA, Kota c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | 02 /
SAKAGUCHI, Yumi c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | [2023/32] |
Former [2021/29] | 01 /
TOMITA, Kota c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD., 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
SAKAGUCHI, Yumi c/o SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD., 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19869141.2 | 01.10.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019JP38669 | Priority number, date | JP20180189197 | 04.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018189197 | [2021/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020071342 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3851488 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3851488 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08L9/06, B60C1/00, C08K3/04, C08K3/36, C08L101/02, C08L101/14 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
B60C1/0016 (EP);
C08K3/04 (EP);
C08K3/36 (EP);
C08L9/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L9/06 (EP);
C08K3/36, C08L9/06 (EP);
C08L9/06, C08L9/06, C08L47/00, C08K3/04, C08K3/22, C08K5/09, C08K5/18, C08K3/06, C08K5/47 (EP);
C08L9/06, C08L91/00, C08L9/06, C08L47/00, C08K3/04, C08K3/22, C08K5/09, C08K5/18, C08K3/06, C08K5/47 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIFENPROFILKAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND LUFTREIFEN | [2021/29] | English: | TREAD RUBBER COMPOSITION AND PNEUMATIC TIRE | [2021/29] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC POUR BANDE DE ROULEMENT ET PNEUMATIQUE | [2021/29] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2021 | Translation filed | 12.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 29.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | MC | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | LU | 01.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
LU | 01.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
LU | 01.10.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP3176001 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0051]; examples 1,3; table 1 *; | [X]EP3187532 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [X] 1-4* paragraph [0135]; examples 13,14; table 1 *; | [X]EP3216828 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0126]; examples 2,3; table 1 *; | [X]EP3228657 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0193]; examples 1-17; table 2 *; | [X]EP3228658 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0227]; examples 1-23; table 2 *; | [X]US2017355835 (NAKAJIMA HIROKI [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0086]; examples 2-5; table 2 * | International search | [X]JPS6115319B [X] 1, 3, 4* , *; | [XY]JPS6324436B [X] 1-4 * , 0060, 0063, & JP 2017-206583 A & US 2019/0062538 A1; Claims, 0060, 0064, Example 17, Table 4 & EP 3459996 A1 & CN 109071889 A * [Y] 2; | [XY]JP2016210937 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1-4 * , * [Y] 2 | by applicant | JP2010111753 | JP2017160291 | - The Society of Polymer Science, Japan, vol. 29, no. 9, page 2055 |