EP3861978 - MAKEUP BASE COSMETIC COMPOSITION FOR SKIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Household & Health Care Ltd. 58 Saemunan-ro Jongno-gu Seoul 03184 / KR | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUN, Seung Hyun Magok-dong) 70, Magokjungang 10-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07795 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Seo Yeon Magok-dong) 70, Magokjungang 10-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07795 / KR | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/32] | Application number, filing date | 19869265.9 | 04.06.2019 | [2021/32] | WO2019KR06745 | Priority number, date | KR20180118110 | 04.10.2018 Original published format: KR 20180118110 | [2021/32] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020071613 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3861978 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3861978 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/73, A61K8/02, A61K8/81, A61K8/87, A61K8/06, A61Q1/14 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
A61K8/731 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/0245 (KR);
A61K8/027 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/062 (KR,US);
A61K8/81 (KR);
A61K8/8141 (KR);
A61K8/8152 (EP);
A61K8/8176 (KR);
A61K8/87 (KR);
A61Q1/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2800/413 (EP,US);
A61K2800/594 (US);
A61K2800/884 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUM SCHMINKEN DER HAUT | [2021/32] | English: | MAKEUP BASE COSMETIC COMPOSITION FOR SKIN | [2021/32] | French: | COMPOSITION COSMÉTIQUE DE BASE DE MAQUILLAGE POUR LA PEAU | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2021 | Translation filed | 06.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 18.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2017150950 ; | International search | [Y]KR20160146259 (BEAUTY COSMETIC CO LTD [KR]); | [XY]JP2017048293 (SUGINO MACH); | [A]KR20170060744 (JEJULOVE CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR101791840B (H&B CO LTD [KR]); | [XY]KR20180016925 (LG HOUSEHOLD & HEALTH CARE LTD [KR]) | by applicant | KR20170103698 |