EP3861790 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SCHEDULING RESOURCE ALLOCATION OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Huei-Ming 52 Tyrone Street South Yarra, Victoria 3141 / AU | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/32] | Application number, filing date | 19869321.0 | 08.08.2019 | [2021/32] | WO2019CN99864 | Priority number, date | US201862739513P | 01.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862739513 P | [2021/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020069649 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3861790 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/16, H04W4/46, H04W4/44, H04W72/04 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
H04W4/46 (EP,CN);
H04W72/044 (CN,US);
H04W72/12 (CN,US);
H04W4/40 (CN,US);
H04W4/44 (EP,CN);
H04W72/23 (EP);
H04W72/231 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR RESSOURCENZUWEISUNGSPLANUNG DAFÜR | [2021/32] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SCHEDULING RESOURCE ALLOCATION OF SAME | [2021/32] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE PLANIFICATION D'ATTRIBUTION DE RESSOURCES DE CELUI-CI | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 31.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2017135881 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) [A] 1-79 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2018004323 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-79 * the whole document *; | [X]CN108347772 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-79 * description, paragraphs [0177]-[0243], [0360]-[0362], and figures 1, 2, 11-13 *; | [A] - LENOVO, "Mechanisms for V2V resource allocation", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #84 Rl-161014, (20160219), XP051064494 [A] 1-79 * , the whole document * | by applicant | CN108347772 | - XIAOMI COMMUNICATIONS, "On resource allocation of V2x communications", 3GPP DRAFT; Rl-1811422 | - NTT DOCOMO et al., "Sidelink resource allocation mechanism", 3GPP DRAFT; Rl-1811335 |