EP3844318 - METHODS FOR MAKING SILICON AND NITROGEN CONTAINING FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Versum Materials US, LLC 8555 S. River Parkway Tempe, AZ 85284 / US | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEI, Xinjian 8555 S. River Parkway Tempe, AZ 85284 / US | 02 /
KIM, Moo-sung 8555 S. River Parkway Tempe, AZ 85284 / US | 03 /
LEE, Se-won 8555 S. River Parkway Tempe, AZ 85284 / US | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Sommer, Andrea Andrea Sommer Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Uhlandstraße 2 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/27] | Sommer, Andrea Andrea Sommer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Uhlandstraße 2 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19869361.6 | 02.10.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019US54268 | Priority number, date | US201862740478P | 03.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862740478 P | [2021/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020072625 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3844318 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/02, C23C16/455, C23C16/34, C23C16/56, C23C16/36, C23C16/505, C07F7/12 | [2022/22] | CPC: |
H01L21/0228 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/45553 (EP,KR,US);
C07F7/12 (EP,KR);
C23C16/308 (US);
C23C16/345 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/36 (EP,US);
C23C16/45531 (EP,US);
C23C16/45536 (KR);
C23C16/45542 (EP,US);
C23C16/505 (EP,US);
C23C16/56 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02126 (EP);
H01L21/0214 (EP,US);
H01L21/02167 (EP);
H01L21/0217 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02208 (US);
H01L21/02211 (EP);
H01L21/02219 (KR);
H01L21/02274 (EP);
H01L21/02326 (EP,US);
H01L21/0234 (EP,US);
H01L21/02348 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/27] | C23C16/455, C23C16/34, C23C16/56, H01L21/02, C07F7/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SILICIUM- UND STICKSTOFFHALTIGEN SCHICHTEN | [2021/27] | English: | METHODS FOR MAKING SILICON AND NITROGEN CONTAINING FILMS | [2021/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE FILMS CONTENANT DU SILICIUM ET DE L'AZOTE | [2021/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 03.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]KR20180010994 (DNF CO LTD [KR]); | [XYI]US2018033614 (CHANDRA HARIPIN [US], et al); | US2019249296 [ ] (JANG SE JIN [KR], et al) | International search | [X]US2011256734 (HAUSMANN DENNIS M [US], et al) [X] 8-12,23-24; | [X]US2013078376 (HIGASHINO KATSUKO [US], et al)[X] 23-24; | [YX]WO2016149541 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [Y] 18-20 [X] 23-24; | [YX]US2018033614 (CHANDRA HARIPIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-7,13-20,22 [X] 21,23-24; | [YX]KR20180034581 (VERSUM MAT US LLC [US]) [Y] 1-7,13-20,22 [X] 23-24 | by applicant | US5069244 | JP2000100812 | US6077356 | US6355582 | US7334595 | US2009155606 | KR20180010994 | US2018033614 | WO2018057677 | WO2018063907 | US9984868 | US10049882 | - OLSEN, "Analysis of LPCVD Process Conditions for the Deposition of Low Stress Silicon Nitride", Materials Science in Semiconductor Process, (20020000), vol. 5, doi:10.1016/S1369-8001(02)00058-6, page 51, XP004383353 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1369-8001(02)00058-6 | - TAYLOR et al., "Hexachlorodisilane as a Precursor in the LPCVD of Silicon Dioxide and Silicon Oxynitride Films", J. Electrochem. Soc., (19890000), vol. 136, page 2382, XP000117260 | - M. TANAKA et al., "Film Properties of Low-k Silicon Nitride Films Formed by Hexachlorodisilane and Ammonia", J. Electrochem. Soc., (20000000), vol. 147, page 2284 |