EP3861020 - COMPOSITION AND METHODS FOR TREATING ACUTE DIARRHEA AND ENTERIC INFECTIONS IN ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anubis Bio Corporation 2817 Trenton Lane Oviedo FL 32765 / US | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULTZ, Thomas, A. 2817 Trenton Lane Oviedo, FL 32765 / US | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2021/32] | Application number, filing date | 19869363.2 | 02.10.2019 | [2021/32] | WO2019US54283 | Priority number, date | US201862740769P | 03.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862740769 P | [2021/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020072636 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3861020 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/12, C07K16/08, C07K16/02, A61K9/00, A23K10/20, A23K20/147, A23K50/40, A61K35/20, A61K39/42, A61K45/06, A61P31/04, A61P1/12, A61P31/20 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
A61P1/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/42 (EP,US);
A23K10/20 (EP);
A23K20/147 (EP,US);
A23K50/40 (EP,US);
A61K35/20 (EP,US);
A61K35/57 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP,US);
A61P31/20 (EP,US);
C07K16/02 (EP);
C07K16/081 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K35/20, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/32, A23V2250/5424, A23V2250/5434 (EP) |
Former IPC [2021/32] | C07K16/12, A61K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AKUTER DIARRHOE UND ENTERALEN INFEKTIONEN BEI TIEREN | [2021/32] | English: | COMPOSITION AND METHODS FOR TREATING ACUTE DIARRHEA AND ENTERIC INFECTIONS IN ANIMALS | [2021/32] | French: | COMPOSITION ET MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE LA DIARRHÉE AIGUË ET ENTÉRIQUE | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 14.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/24] | 31.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012141458 (STARZL TIMOTHY W [US]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph [0046] * * page 13, paragraph [0155]; example 1; claims 1-7, 10-29 * * page 16, paragraph [0189] - page 18, paragraph [0213] *; | [T] - BATTERSBY IAN ET AL, "Differential diagnosis and treatment of acute diarrhoea in the dog and cat", IN PRACTICE,, (20060831), vol. 28, no. 8, doi:10.1136/INPRACT.28.8.480, ISSN 2042-7689, pages 480 - 488, XP009526851 [T] * abstract * * page 485, column right - page 488 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/inpract.28.8.480 | [T] - Marcotte Harold ET AL, "Passive Immunization: Toward Magic Bullets", Mucosal Immunology, doi:10.1016/B978-0-12-415847-4.00071-9, (20150313), pages 1403 - 1434, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC7150278/pdf/main.pdf, (20220222), XP055894273 [T] * abstract * * page 1406, column right, paragraph 1st full - page 1407, column left, paragraph 2nd full; tables 1, 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/B978-0-12-415847-4.00071-9 | International search | [XY]US2012141458 (STARZL TIMOTHY W [US]) [X] 1-6, 8-16, 18-20 * Especially Abstract, para [0013], [0027], [0046], [0063], [0095], [0155], [0212] * [Y] 7, 17; | [Y] - Battersby, Ian; Harvey, Andrea, "Differential diagnosis and treatment of acute diarrhoea in the dog and cat", In Practice, (20060900), vol. 28, no. 8, doi:10.1136/inpract.28.8.480, pages 480 - 488, XP009526851 [Y] 7, 17 * Especially Abstract, pg 481 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/inpract.28.8.480 |