EP3860652 - ANTIBODIES TARGETING EPN1 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immunome, Inc. 665 Stockton Drive, Suite 300 Exton, PA 19341 / US | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBINSON, Matthew, K. 981 Blue Rock Lane Blue Bell, PA 19422 / US | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Jacobi, Markus Alexander Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2021/32] | Application number, filing date | 19869443.2 | 02.10.2019 | [2021/32] | WO2019US54259 | Priority number, date | US201862740092P | 02.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862740092 P | [2021/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020072618 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3860652 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P35/00, C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C07K16/18, A61K39/00 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
C07K16/28 (EP,KR);
C07K16/30 (EP,US);
C07K16/468 (US);
C12N15/63 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR);
C07K2317/21 (EP);
C07K2317/31 (KR,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/56 (KR);
C07K2317/565 (KR);
C07K2317/622 (KR,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/77 (KR);
C07K2317/92 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/32] | A61K39/395, A61P35/00, C07K16/28, C07K16/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Title | German: | GEGEN EPN1 GERICHTETE ANTIKÖRPER | [2021/32] | English: | ANTIBODIES TARGETING EPN1 | [2021/32] | French: | ANTICORPS CIBLANT EPN1 | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 06.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005164194 (HAFEN ERNST [CH], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0003] , [00 4] , [00 5]; claims 1, 16 *; | [E]WO2020081786 (IMMUNOME INC [US]) [E] 1-17 * claim 5 *; | [A] - HORVATH ET AL, "Epsin: Inducing membrane curvature", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND CELL BIOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070101), vol. 39, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.BIOCEL.2006.12.004, ISSN 1357-2725, pages 1765 - 1770, XP022223896 [A] 1-17 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biocel.2006.12.004 | [A] - DONG JERRY ET AL, "Therapeutic efficacy of a synthetic epsin mimetic peptide in glioma tumor model: uncovering multiple mechanisms beyond the VEGF-associated tumor angiogenesis", JOURNAL OF NEURO-ONCOLOGY, SPRINGER US, NEW YORK, vol. 138, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S11060-018-2766-Z, ISSN 0167-594X, (20180122), pages 17 - 27, (20180122), XP036492020 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11060-018-2766-z | International search | [A]US6031079 (FORD-HUTCHINSON ANTHONY [CA], et al) [A] 1-5, 24-28 * entire document *; | [A]US6720180 (PILCHER BRIAN K [US]) [A] 1-5, 24-28* entire document *; | [A]US9782350 (DANNHUSER PHILIP [DE], et al) [A] 1-5, 24-28 * entire document *; | [A] - CHEN et al., "Epsin 1 is a cargo-specific adaptor for the clathrin-mediated endocytosis of the influenza virus", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A, (20080808), vol. 105, no. 33, doi:10.1073/pnas.0803711105, pages 11790 - 11795, XP055699381 [A] 1-5, 24-28 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0803711105 | [A] - SZYMANSKA et al., "Interaction with epsin 1 regulates the constitutive clathrin-dependent internalization of ErbB3", Biochimica et Biophysica Acta, (20160311), vol. 1863, doi:10.1016/j.bbamcr.2016.03.011, pages 1179 - 1188, XP029516151 [A] 1-5, 24-28 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbamcr.2016.03.011 | by applicant | US4957735 | US5061620 | US2005164194 | US8999707 | WO2020081786 | - HORVATH et al., The International Journal of Biochemistry and Cell Biology, (20070000), vol. 39, no. 10, pages 1765 - 1770 | - DONG et al., Journal of Neuro-Oncology, (20180000), vol. 138, no. 1, pages 17 - 27 | - SZYMANSKA et al., Biochimica et Biophysica Acta, (20160000), vol. 1863, no. 6, pages 1179 - 1188 | - LEFRANC, M.-P. et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19990000), vol. 27, pages 209 - 212 | - FRANKEL et al., Mol. Immunol., (19790000), vol. 16, pages 101 - 106 | - CONNOR et al., Pharm Ther, (19850000), vol. 28, pages 341 - 365 | - RUTHER et al., EMBO J, (19830000), vol. 2, page 1791 | - INOUYEINOUYE, Nucleic Acids Res, (19850000), vol. 13, pages 3101 - 3109 | - VAN HEEKESCHUSTER, J. Biol. Chem., (19890000), vol. 24, pages 5503 - 5509 | WO2019US32780 |