Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11592004 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2023 | B2 | US2021222676 | 22.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018190582 | 09.10.2018 | JP2018190583 | 09.10.2018 | JP2019072001 | 04.04.2019 | JP2019079604 | 18.04.2019 | WO2019JP39069 | 03.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210071021 | Global Dossier | 15.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018190582 | 09.10.2018 | JP2018190583 | 09.10.2018 | JP2019072001 | 04.04.2019 | JP2019079604 | 18.04.2019 | WO2019JP39069 | 03.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7368952B | Global Dossier | 25.10.2023 | B2 | JP2020169637 | 15.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018190583 | 09.10.2018 | JP2019072001 | 04.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7191627B | Global Dossier | 19.12.2022 | B2 | JP2020060113 | 16.04.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018190582 | 09.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112840122 | Global Dossier | 25.05.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018190582 | 09.10.2018 | JP2018190583 | 09.10.2018 | JP2019072001 | 04.04.2019 | JP2019079604 | 18.04.2019 | WO2019JP39069 | 03.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3865706 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2023 | B1 | EP3865706 | 13.07.2022 | A4 | EP3865706 | 18.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018190582 | 09.10.2018 | JP2018190583 | 09.10.2018 | JP2019072001 | 04.04.2019 | JP2019079604 | 18.04.2019 | WO2019JP39069 | 03.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020075617 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018190582 | 09.10.2018 | JP2018190583 | 09.10.2018 | JP2019072001 | 04.04.2019 | JP2019079604 | 18.04.2019 |