EP3864507 - TISSUE LOCALIZATION DEVICE AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hologic, Inc. 250 Campus Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2022/13] |
Former [2021/33] | For all designated states Focal Therapeutics, Inc. 1010 Stewart Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERMANN, George D. 13030 La Poloma Road Los Altos Hills, California 94022 / US | 02 /
OLSON, Jonathan M. 6134 Valley Glen Drive San Jose, California 95123 / US | 03 /
LEBOVIC, Gail S. 4556 Biltmoore Drive Frisco, Texas 75034 / US | 04 /
GROVE, Charles 49 Joost Ave. San Francisco, California 94131 / US | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Hoyng Rokh Monegier B.V. Rembrandt Tower, 30th Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [2021/33] | Application number, filing date | 19871414.9 | 11.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019US55832 | Priority number, date | US201816159432 | 12.10.2018 Original published format: US201816159432 | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020077207 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3864507 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/4401, G06F1/26, G06F1/32, A61B90/00, // A61B90/50 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
A61B90/50 (EP);
G06F9/4401 (US);
A61B90/39 (EP);
G06F1/26 (US);
G06F1/3234 (US);
G06F1/3265 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00128 (EP);
A61B2090/378 (EP);
A61B2090/3925 (EP);
A61B2090/3937 (EP);
A61B2090/3966 (EP);
A61B2090/3987 (EP);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/33] | G06F9/4401, G06F1/26, G06F1/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | GEWEBELOKALISIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2021/33] | English: | TISSUE LOCALIZATION DEVICE AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF | [2021/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LOCALISATION DE TISSUS ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 10.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004168692 (FOGARTY THOMAS J [US], et al) [X] 7-11 * para. 134;; figures 2-3 * [I] 1-6,12-15; | [A]WO2005096764 (CIVCO MEDICAL INSTR CO INC [US], et al) [A] 12-15 * figure 3A *; | [XI]US2009221913 (VOEGELE JAMES W [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * para. 30;; figures 1-12 * [I] 12-15; | [A]WO2016193753 (ENDOMAGNETICS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15* marker for superior ultrasound response * | International search | [Y]US7395563 (WHITMORE III WILLET F [US], et al) [Y] 14-20; | [A]WO2010030872 (DEL PALMA ORTHOPEDICS [US], et al)[A] 1-20; | [Y]US2012123469 (WARDLE JOHN L [US]) [Y] 1-13; | [Y]WO2017181136 (FOCAL THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [Y] 1-20; | [A]US9925088 (CLEM MICHAEL F [US], et al) [A] 1-20 | by applicant | US2004168692 | WO2005096764 | US2009221913 | WO2016193753 |