EP3864199 - COMPARTMENTALIZED ASSAYS OF BISPECIFIC AND MULTISPECIFIC BIOLOGICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amberstone Biosciences, Inc. 23181 Verdugo Drive, Suite 106 Laguna Hills, CA 92653 / US | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, George Guikai 23181 Verdugo Dr., Suite 106 Laguna Hills, California 92653 / US | 02 /
SHANG, Yonglei 23181 Verdugo Dr., Suite 106 Laguna Hills, California 92653 / US | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartG mbB Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | [2021/33] | Application number, filing date | 19871473.5 | 07.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019US55047 | Priority number, date | US201862742837P | 08.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862742837 P | US201862784171P | 21.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862784171 P | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020076730 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3864199 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C40B30/04, C40B30/06, B01L3/00, B01J19/00, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/6897 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
G01N33/6845 (EP);
G01N33/502 (US);
B01L3/502761 (US);
C12N15/1034 (EP);
C12N15/1075 (EP);
C12Q1/6804 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C12N15/1075, C12Q2563/103, C12Q2563/107 (EP);
C12Q1/6804, C12Q2525/185, C12Q2535/122, C12Q2563/159 (EP);
C12Q1/6897, C12Q2525/185, C12Q2535/122, C12Q2563/159 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/33] | C40B30/04, C40B30/06, B01L3/00, B01J19/00, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | KOMPARTIMENTIERTE TESTS FÜR BISPEZIFISCHE UND MULTISPEZIFISCHE BIOLOGIKA | [2021/33] | English: | COMPARTMENTALIZED ASSAYS OF BISPECIFIC AND MULTISPECIFIC BIOLOGICS | [2021/33] | French: | DOSAGES COMPARTIMENTÉS DE PRODUITS BIOLOGIQUES BISPÉCIFIQUES ET MULTISPÉCIFIQUES | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 19.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.12.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US8415173 (HARRIMAN WILLIAM DON [US]); | [X]WO2016174229 (EUROPEAN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY LABORATORY [DE]); | [X]WO2017132627 (ACHAOGEN INC [US]); | [X]CN107810413 (EUROPEAN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY LABORATORY); | [X]WO2018170013 (GIGAGEN INC [US]) | International search | [A]WO9841869 (CHROMAXOME CORP [US]) [A] 1-12, 13/1-12, 22-31, 42 * ; page 5, lines 4-8; lines 29-32 *; | [A]WO2014035693 (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al) [A] 1-12, 13/1-12, 22-31, 42 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0004], [0006], [0008], [0083], [00170] *; | [A]US2017296678 (FROST GREGORY IAN [US], et al) [A] 1-12, 13/1-12, 22-31, 42 * ; paragraph [0133] *; | [PY]WO2018204150 (WU GUIKAI [US]) [P] 1-12, 13 * ; entire document * [Y] 1-12, 22-31, 42; | [PY] - SEGALINY et al., "Functional TCR T cell screening using single- cell droplet microfluidics", Lab Chip., (20181204), vol. 18, no. 24, doi:10.1039/C8LC00818C, pages 3733 - 3749, XP055578872 [P] 1-12, 13 * ; entire document. DOI:10.1039/c8lc00818c. * [Y] 1-12, 22-31, 42 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C8LC00818C |