EP3863633 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR ADJUVANT CANCER THERAPEUTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Duke University 2812 Erwin Road, Suite 306, Box 90083 Durham NC 27705 / US | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Pei c/o Duke University 2812 Erwin Road, Suite 306 Box 90083 Durham, NC 27705 / US | 02 /
HONG, Jiyong c/o Duke University 2812 Erwin Road, Suite 306 Box 90083 Durham, NC 27705 / US | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Harris, Oliver John Richard Novagraaf UK Centrum Norwich Research Park Colney Lane Norwich NR4 7UG / GB | [2021/33] | Application number, filing date | 19871841.3 | 09.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019US55481 | Priority number, date | US201862743004P | 09.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862743004 P | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020077014 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3863633 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4706, A61K31/131, A61K31/47, C07D215/16, C07D215/38, C07D215/42 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
C07D215/38 (EP);
A61K31/4706 (US);
A61K31/47 (EP);
A61K33/243 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (US);
A61P35/04 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/47, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR ADJUVANTE KREBSTHERAPEUTIKA | [2021/33] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR ADJUVANT CANCER THERAPEUTICS | [2021/33] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES POUR LE TRAITEMENT ADJUVANT DU CANCER | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 13.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2012093741 (NAT CANCER CT [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 14 - page 15 *; | [E]EP3603641 (UNIV HANYANG IND UNIV COOP FOUND [KR], et al) [E] 1-15 * paragraph [0052] * * examples 6,7 * * claims 13,14 * * paragraph [0062] *; | [XI] - JEONG KYUNG-CHAE ET AL, "Intravesical Instillation of c-MYC Inhibitor KSI-3716 Suppresses Orthotopic Bladder Tumor Growth", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20130717), vol. 191, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JURO.2013.07.019, ISSN 0022-5347, pages 510 - 518, XP028813254 [X] 1-3,9,10,15 * page 512 * * page 517 * [I] 4-8,11-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.juro.2013.07.019 | [I] - KYUNG-CHAE JEONG ET AL, "Small-molecule inhibitors of c-Myc transcriptional factor suppress proliferation and induce apoptosis of promyelocytic leukemia cell via cell cycle arrest", MOLECULAR BIOSYSTEMS, GB, (20100101), vol. 6, no. 8, doi:10.1039/c002534h, ISSN 1742-206X, page 1503, XP055613444 [I] 1-15 * page 1505, column 1 * * figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c002534h | International search | [A]US2010120849 (CHUNG KWANG HOE [KR], et al) [A] 1-9, 55-57* entire document *; | [A]US2016038455 (GILL GURMIT S [AU], et al) [A] 1-9, 55-57 * entire document * | [A] - PUBCHEM, (20130204), Database accession no. 160693684 [A] 1-9, 55-57 * . entire document * |