EP3864025 - POLYPEPTIDES INCLUDING A BETA-TRICALCIUM PHOSPHATE-BINDING SEQUENCE AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Theradaptive, Inc. 5350 Partners Court Suite B Frederick MD 21703 / US | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALVAREZ, Luis 5350 Partners Court, Suite B Frederick Maryland 21703 / US | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2024/19] |
Former [2021/33] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19871962.7 | 11.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019US55939 | Priority number, date | US201862744941P | 12.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862744941 P | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020077265 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3864025 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3864025 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, C07K7/08, C07K14/475, C07K14/51, A61K38/18, A61K47/64, A61P19/00, A61P19/02 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
A61P19/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07K7/06 (EP,KR);
C07K7/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/04 (US);
A61K38/16 (US);
A61K38/1875 (KR,US);
A61K47/642 (KR);
A61P19/02 (EP,KR);
C07K14/001 (US);
C07K14/475 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/51 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Extension states | BA | 03.05.2021 | ME | 03.05.2021 | Validation states | KH | 03.05.2021 | MA | 03.05.2021 | MD | 03.05.2021 | TN | 03.05.2021 | Title | German: | POLYPEPTIDE MIT EINER BETA-TRICALCIUMPHOSPHATBINDENDEN SEQUENZ UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [2021/33] | English: | POLYPEPTIDES INCLUDING A BETA-TRICALCIUM PHOSPHATE-BINDING SEQUENCE AND USES THEREOF | [2021/33] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES COMPRENANT UNE SÉQUENCE DE LIAISON AU PHOSPHATE BÊTA-TRICALCIQUE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 23.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24173524.0 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012078671 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2006193916 (LAZAROVA MIRELLA [US], et al); | [XYA]US2014037593 (ALVAREZ LUIS [US], et al); | by applicant | WO2006012414 | US2006040354 |