EP3863733 - HARNESS BACK PLATE AND STRAP ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MSA Technology, LLC 1000 Cranberry Woods Drive Cranberry Township, PA 16066 / US | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONAHAN, Michael, D. 1840 Allison Avenue Allison Park, Pennsylvania 15101 / US | 02 /
HALL, Mark, Allen 1563 Haine School Road Cranberry Township, Pennsylvania 16066 / US | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Holzwarth-Rochford, Andreas Jones Day Nextower Thurn-und-Taxis-Platz 6 60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/33] | Cordy, Nicole Jessica Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 19872226.6 | 11.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019US55807 | Priority number, date | US201862745034P | 12.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862745034 P | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020077189 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3863733 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A62B35/00, A44B11/00, A44B11/02, A44B11/04, A44B11/06 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
A62B35/0031 (EP,US);
A62B35/0025 (US);
A62B35/0018 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | GURTRÜCKHALTEPLATTE UND GURTANORDNUNG | [2021/33] | English: | HARNESS BACK PLATE AND STRAP ARRANGEMENT | [2021/33] | French: | PLAQUE ARRIÈRE DE HARNAIS ET AGENCEMENT DE SANGLE | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 28.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0807451 (MECKEL GMBH SICHERHEITSSYSTEME [DE]) [Y] 1-15* figures 5-8 *; | [Y]US2004065272 (REYNOLDS RICHARD G [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figure 6 *; | [Y]WO2005025677 (DB IND INC [US]) [Y] 9,10 * figures 10-19 *; | [Y]JP2015080578 (TANIZAWA SEISAKUSHO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1-4 * | International search | [Y]US2004065272 (REYNOLDS RICHARD G [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * entire document *; | [Y]JP2015080578 (TANIZAWA SEISAKUSHO LTD) [Y] 1-19* machine translation * | by applicant | EP0807451 | US2004065272 | WO2005025677 | JP2015080578 |