EP3863615 - METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF SOLID TUMOR CANCERS USING ILLUDINS AND BIOMARKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lantern Pharma Inc. 1920 McKinney Avenue, 7th Floor Dallas, TX 75201 / US | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KULKAMI, Aditya 920 McKinney Avenue Dallas, TX 75201 / US | 02 /
VEDARAJU, Yuvanesh 920 McKinney Avenue Dallas, TX 75201 / US | 03 /
KATHAD, Umesh 920 McKinney Avenue Dallas, TX 75201 / US | 04 /
ASAITHAMBI, Arun 920 McKinney Avenue Dallas, TX 75201 / US | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Träger, Denis Dr. Träger & Strautmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Stüvestrasse 2 49076 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/33] | Kuttenkeuler, David Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19872565.7 | 14.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019US56039 | Priority number, date | US201862745382P | 14.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862745382 P | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020081414 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3863615 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/122, C07C239/14, C12Q1/686, A61K31/17, A61P35/00, C12Q1/6886 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP);
A61K31/122 (EP);
A61K31/17 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12Q2600/158 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/33] | A61K31/122, C07C239/14, C12Q1/686 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBSEN MIT SOLIDEN TUMOREN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ILLUDINEN UND BIOMARKERN | [2021/33] | English: | METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF SOLID TUMOR CANCERS USING ILLUDINS AND BIOMARKERS | [2021/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DE CANCERS À TUMEUR SOLIDE À L'AIDE D'ILLUDINES ET DE BIOMARQUEURS | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 30.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO2007019308 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al); | [XY]US9725769 (KNUDSEN STEEN [US]); | [I]WO2018170230 (MEMORIAL SLOAN KETTERING CANCER CENTER [US]); | International search | [Y]US2008306147 (MCMORRIS TREVOR C [US], et al) [Y] 19/19, 19/18 * ; paragraphs [0005], [0031] *; | [Y]US2016015658 (KELNER MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 1-6, 9-10, 15 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0234]-[0236], [0281] *; | [XY]US2018100197 (KNUDSEN STEEN [US]) [X] 16-18 * ; paragraphs [0005]-[0007], [0018], [0031], [0073]-[0074], [0123], [0127], pages 35-36 * [Y] 1-7, 9-10, 15, 19/16, 19/18; | [A]WO2018170230 (MEMORIAL SLOAN KETTERING CANCER CENTER [US]) [A] 1-7, 9-10, 15-18, 19/16, 19/18* ; entire document *; | [Y] - PIETSCH, KE et al., "Quantification of acylfulvene- and illudin S-DNA adducts in cells with variable bioactivation capacities", Chemical Research in Toxicology, (20130118), vol. 26, no. 1, doi:10.1021/tx300430r, pages 146 - 155, XP055415547 [Y] 7 * ; abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/tx300430r |