EP3869068 - BALL SCREW DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THK Co., Ltd. 12-10, Shibaura 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8506 / JP | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIDE, Tetsuhiro c/o THK CO., LTD. 12-10, Shibaura 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8506 / JP | 02 /
IWASHIRO, Sho c/o THK CO., LTD. 12-10, Shibaura 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8506 / JP | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 19872741.4 | 02.10.2019 | [2021/34] | WO2019JP38901 | Priority number, date | JP20180197357 | 19.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018197357 | [2021/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020080106 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3869068 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3869068 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16H25/24, F16H25/22 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
F16H25/2219 (EP);
F16H25/2214 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUGELROLLSPINDELVORRICHTUNG | [2021/34] | English: | BALL SCREW DEVICE | [2021/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VIS À BILLES | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2021 | Translation filed | 04.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 06.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2023 | CZ | 06.12.2023 | EE | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | PT | 08.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2018096539 (THK CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 5; | [Y]US2018251150 (OGNIBENE CLAUDIO [IT]) [Y] 5* paragraph [0188] - paragraph [0190]; figures 11, 12 * | International search | [Y]JPH06257657 (SENSEI MUNEHIRO) [Y] 5 * , *; | [A]EP1500572 (ZF LENKSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5* , *; | [A]WO2007029716 (NSK LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * , *; | [XY]JP2018096539 (THK CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * , * [Y] 5 |