EP3863453 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR PRODUCING AN AEROSOL FOR INHALATION BY A PERSON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qnovia, Inc. 2920 West Broad St. 243 Richmond VA 23230 / US | [2022/44] |
Former [2021/33] | For all designated states Respira Technologies, Inc. 1925 Century Park E, Suite 1700 Los Angeles, CA 90067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANEK, Mario 11571 Ohio Ave., 2 Los Angeles, CA 90025 / US | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2021/33] | Application number, filing date | 19873037.6 | 17.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019US56830 | Priority number, date | US201862747260P | 18.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862747260 P | US201962794274P | 18.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962794274 P | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020081874 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3863453 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00, A61M15/06, B05B17/04, A24F40/05, A24F40/40, A24F40/48, A61K9/00, A61K9/127, A61K31/05, A24B15/167, A61K31/352, A61K31/465, A61M11/00, A61M15/00, A61M16/00 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
A24F40/40 (EP);
A24F40/05 (EP,US);
A24B15/167 (EP,US);
A24F40/48 (EP);
A61K31/05 (EP);
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
A61K31/465 (EP,US);
A61K9/0073 (EP);
A61K9/127 (EP,US);
A61M11/005 (EP);
A61M15/0023 (EP);
A61M15/0085 (EP);
A61M15/009 (US);
A61M15/06 (EP);
B65D83/0011 (US);
A24F40/10 (EP);
A61M11/001 (EP);
A61M2016/0021 (EP);
A61M2205/0294 (US);
A61M2205/10 (EP);
A61M2205/103 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/33] | A24F47/00, A61M15/06, B05B17/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES AEROSOLS ZUR INHALATION DURCH EINE PERSON | [2021/33] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR PRODUCING AN AEROSOL FOR INHALATION BY A PERSON | [2021/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE POUR PRODUIRE UN AÉROSOL DESTINÉ À ÊTRE INHALÉ PAR UNE PERSONNE | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 17.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US8353287 (HOLLEN DIRK VON [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 3, lines 38-59 * * column 4, lines 12-14 * * column 4, lines 55-65 * * column 5, lines 7-14 * * column 8, lines 25-42 * * column 11, lines 27-45 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]CN206043434U (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,7 * the whole document *; | [X]EP3298912 (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0008] , [0034] , [0036] , [0038] , [0039] * * figures 2,3 *; | [X]US2018161525 (LIU JIANFU [CN], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0031] , [0033] , [0037] , [0040] , [0041] , [0044] , [0046] , [0047] * * figures 1-10 *; | [X]US2018289907 (MARMUR ABRAHAM [IL], et al) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0147] - [0156] ** figure 8 *; | EP3469929 [ ] (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * paragraphs [0024] - [0033] * * figures 2,3 * | International search | [Y]KR20100097807 (DNC ENGINEERING CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 3, 4 * ; see machine translation *; | [A]KR20120104964 (EBACO CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-16* ; see machine translation *; | [Y]US2017119059 (ZUBER GERARD [CH], et al) [Y] 4, 7-9 * ; paragraphs [0033], [0036], [0113], [0114] *; | [Y]FR3064490 (ENOVAP [FR]) [Y] 10-12 * ; see machine translation *; | [XY]US2018289907 (MARMUR ABRAHAM [IL], et al) [X] 1, 2, 5, 6, 13-16 * ; figures 1, 2B; paragraphs [0107], [0113], [0122]-[0124] * [Y] 3, 4, 7-12 | by applicant | CN20604343U | US8353287 | EP3298912 | US2018161525 | US2018289907 | - International Journal of Environmental Research and Public Health |