EP3855537 - LEAD STORAGE BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GS Yuasa International Ltd. 1, Inobaba-cho, Nishinosho Kisshoin, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8520 / JP | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONISHI, Mikito c/o GS Yuasa International Ltd., 1, Inobaba-cho Nishinosho, Kisshoin, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8520 / JP | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 19873078.0 | 16.10.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019JP40715 | Priority number, date | JP20180194795 | 16.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018194795 | [2021/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020080419 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3855537 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/14, H01M4/20, H01M4/56, H01M4/62, H01M4/73, H01M4/82, H01M4/68, H01M10/06, H01M4/02 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
H01M10/06 (EP);
H01M4/14 (EP);
H01M4/56 (EP);
H01M4/68 (EP);
H01M4/685 (EP);
H01M4/73 (EP);
H01M4/82 (EP);
H01M2004/021 (EP);
H01M2004/028 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/30] | H01M4/14, H01M4/20, H01M4/56, H01M4/62, H01M4/73, H01M4/82 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | BLEIAKKUMULATOR | [2021/30] | English: | LEAD STORAGE BATTERY | [2021/30] | French: | BATTERIE DE STOCKAGE AU PLOMB | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2021 | Translation filed | 20.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 16.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014212764 (FUJITA KOHEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0047] * * figure 1 ** claims 1-20 * | International search | [A]JPH06267544 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * , *; | [A]JP2003142147 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD) [A] 1-20* , *; | [A]JP2005056622 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * , *; | [A]WO2012043556 (GS YUASA INT LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * , & CN 103081211 A *; | [A]JP2013122838 (FURUKAWA BATTERY CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * , *; | [A]WO2015056417 (GS YUASA INT LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20 * , & EP 3059791 A1 & CN 105917503 A & US 2016/0254570 A1 *; | [A]JP2017139215 (GS YUASA CORP) [A] 1-20 * , & US 2017/0222214 A1 & CN 107026271 A & EP 3203572 A1 & KR 10-2017-0092111 A * | by applicant | JPS5160936 | JP2015038860 | JP2016225302 |