EP3867219 - POLYCYCLIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIRATAKE, Munenori c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. Kashima Plant, 35, Towada Kamisu-shi Ibaraki, 3140102 / JP | 02 /
ISHIHARA, Kentaro c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008324 / JP | 03 /
HIROSE, Koji c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008324 / JP | 04 /
IKEDA, Shinya c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc., Tokyo Research Laboratory, 1-1, Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | 05 /
KATO, Noriyuki c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc., 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | 06 /
KONDO, Mitsuteru c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc., Tokyo Research Laboratory, 1-1, Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | 07 /
MURATA, Shoko c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc., Tokyo Research Laboratory, 1-1, Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | 08 /
OSHIMA, Kensuke c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc., Tokyo Research Laboratory, 1-1, Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | 09 /
STOLZ, Florian c/o Reuter Chemische Apparatebau e.K. Engesserstrasse 4b 79108 Freiburg / DE | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/34] | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Im Zollhof 1 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 19873937.7 | 18.10.2019 | [2021/34] | WO2019JP42232 | Priority number, date | JP20180197436 | 19.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018197436 | JP20180247874 | 28.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018247874 | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020080558 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3867219 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07C39/23, C07C49/755, C08G64/04 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
C07C43/23 (EP,KR);
C07C43/205 (KR);
C07C43/295 (US);
C07C43/225 (KR);
C07C49/755 (EP);
C08G64/04 (KR);
C08G64/045 (EP);
C08G64/06 (EP,US);
C08G64/307 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/34] | C07C39/23, C08G64/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Title | German: | POLYCYCLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN | [2021/34] | English: | POLYCYCLIC COMPOUNDS | [2021/34] | French: | COMPOSÉS POLYCYCLIQUES | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 28.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2010086385 (NEXAM CHEMICALS AB [SE], et al); | [Y]EP2218747 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [YD]US2016319069 (SHIGEMATSU TERUYUKI [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JPH0625398 (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD); | [A]WO2014073496 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]WO2015129921 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2015170691 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) |