EP3867633 - URINALYSIS DEVICE AND TEST STRIP FOR HOME AND POINT OF CARE USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Youcount Inc. 2200 HSBC Building 885 West Georgia Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6C 3E8 / CA | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECHEV, Teodora 3311 Westmount Road North Vancouver, British Columbia V7V 3G5 / CA | 02 /
DECHEV, Nikolai 3060 Westridge Place Victoria, British Columbia V8W 1C8 / CA | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 19874233.0 | 18.10.2019 | [2021/34] | WO2019CA00149 | Priority number, date | US201816166052 | 19.10.2018 Original published format: US201816166052 | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020077435 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3867633 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 23.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/78, G01N33/48, G01N33/50, C12M1/34, A61B10/00 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
G01N33/48785 (EP,US);
A61B5/14507 (EP,US);
A61B5/1455 (EP);
A61B5/207 (EP);
G01N21/255 (EP);
G01N21/78 (EP,US);
G01N21/8483 (EP);
G01N33/493 (EP,US);
G01N33/6827 (US);
G01N33/70 (US);
A61B2562/0295 (EP,US);
A61B5/0022 (EP);
G01N21/272 (US);
G01N2201/0627 (EP);
G16H10/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Title | German: | URINANALYSEVORRICHTUNG UND TESTSTREIFEN ZUR VERWENDUNG ZUHAUSE UND AM BEHANDLUNGSORT | [2021/34] | English: | URINALYSIS DEVICE AND TEST STRIP FOR HOME AND POINT OF CARE USE | [2021/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE D'URINE ET BANDE DE TEST POUR UN USAGE DOMESTIQUE ET DE POINT D'INTERVENTION | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 17.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/30] | 23.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO2005001444 (BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC [US], et al) [I] 1-4,6-15 * paragraphs (035)-(063);; figure - * [A] 5; | [IA]US2011223673 (PROFITT JAMES A [US]) [I] 1-7,9,11,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0024] - [0077]; figure - *[A] 8,10,13 | International search | [Y]WO2009063185 (SURESCREEN DIAGNOSTICS LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 2-5, 14-19 * pg. 6-8 *; | [Y]US2013267032 (TSAI TUNGMENG [TW], et al) [Y] 19* : * par. [0048]-[0050] *; | [XY]US2018059027 (CHEN CHUNG JUNG [TW], et al) [X] 1, 6-13, 20-31 * : * par. [0004], [0023]-[0026] * [Y] 2-5, 14-19 |