EP3869947 - PET SPRAY TRAINING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Radio Systems Corporation 10427 Petsafe Way Knoxville, TN 37932 / US | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIMIN, Bai 10427 Petsafe Way Knoxville, TN 37932 / US | 02 /
REINHART, Anthony J. 10427 Petsafe Way Knoxville, TN 37932 / US | [2022/03] |
Former [2021/35] | 01 /
WEIMIN, Bai 10427 Petsafe Way Knoxville, TN 37932 / US | ||
02 /
REINHART, Anthony, J. 10427 Petsafe Way Knoxville, TN 37932 / US | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2021/35] | Application number, filing date | 19875028.3 | 22.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019US57449 | Priority number, date | US201816167907 | 23.10.2018 Original published format: US201816167907 | [2021/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020086590 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3869947 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01K15/00 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
A01K15/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | SPRÜHTRAININGSSYSTEM FÜR HAUSTIERE | [2021/35] | English: | PET SPRAY TRAINING SYSTEM | [2021/35] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT D'ANIMAL DE COMPAGNIE PAR PULVÉRISATION | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 05.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4627385 (VINCI RENE [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1-7; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US2003154929 (GROH WILLIAM S [US], et al) [A] 1 * § [0023, 0026-0029, 0030-0032];; figures 1-5; claims 1, 16 *; | [Y]US2013264355 (JODOIN MICHAEL [CA]) [Y] 1-15 * § [0032];; figures 2-4 *; | [Y]US2017142932 (MAININI CHRISTOPHER E [US]) [Y] 1-15 * § [0046, 0048-0056];; figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2017208775 (VAN CUREN GREG [US], et al) [Y] 6,7* paragraph [0057] * | International search | [YA]US4627385 (VINCI RENE [FR]) [Y] 1-3, 6, 8-10, 13, 15-17, 20, 22-24, 27, 29-32, 35, 37 * ; entire document, especially Figs. 2-3; Abstract; col. 2, In 48-62; col. 3, In 4-6; col. 3, In 27-31. * [A] 4-5, 7, 11-12, 14, 18-19, 21, 25-26, 28, 33-34, 36; | [A]US6588376 (GROH WILLIAM S [US]) [A] 1-37 * ; entire document, especially Abstract, Fig. 3-4; col. 1, In 32-46; col. 3, In 36-40; col. 3, In 55-61. *; | [YA]US2013264355 (JODOIN MICHAEL [CA]) [Y] 1-3, 6, 8-10,13, 15-17, 20, 22-24, 27, 29-32, 35, 37 * ; entire document, especially Fig. 1, Abstract; para. [0032]-[0034]. * [A] 4-5, 7, 11-12, 14, 18-19, 21, 25-26, 28, 33-34, 36; | [A]US2015250143 (KLOSSNER KATHY [US]) [A] 1-37* ; entire document. *; | [Y]US2017208775 (VAN CUREN GREG [US], et al) [Y] 2-3, 9-10, 16-17, 23-24, 31-32 * ; entire document, especially para. [0057]. * |