EP3870343 - ELECTROCHEMICAL WASTEWATER TREATMENT SYSTEM WITH CONTROL OF SELECTED COMPOUNDS CONCENTRATION IN THE REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axine Water Technologies Inc. 108-2386 East Mall Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z3 / CA | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILBURN, Geoffrey, Sean Unit 1, 360 Winona Ave. Ottawa, Ontario K1Z 5H7 / CA | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/35] | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19875042.4 | 24.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019US57851 | Priority number, date | US201862750354P | 25.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862750354 P | [2021/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020086842 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3870343 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/22, C02F1/461, // B01D61/12, B01D65/02, C02F1/44, C02F1/66 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
B01D61/12 (EP,KR,US);
C02F1/4672 (EP,KR,US);
C02F9/00 (US);
B01D61/025 (US);
B01D61/027 (US);
B01D61/04 (US);
B01D61/145 (US);
B01D61/16 (US);
B01D61/18 (US);
B01D61/22 (EP,KR,US);
B01D65/02 (EP,KR,US);
C02F1/008 (KR);
C02F1/44 (EP);
C02F1/441 (EP,KR,US);
C02F1/442 (EP,KR,US);
C02F1/444 (EP,KR,US);
C02F1/46104 (KR);
C02F1/66 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2311/04 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2311/18 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2311/2523 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2311/2684 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2321/167 (EP);
C02F2209/40 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B01D2311/04, B01D2311/2684 (EP);
B01D2311/04, B01D2311/2684, B01D2311/18 (EP) |
Former IPC [2021/35] | B01D61/22, C02F1/461, C25B3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHES ABWASSERBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM MIT STEUERUNG DER KONZENTRATION AUSGEWÄHLTER VERBINDUNGEN IM REAKTOR | [2021/35] | English: | ELECTROCHEMICAL WASTEWATER TREATMENT SYSTEM WITH CONTROL OF SELECTED COMPOUNDS CONCENTRATION IN THE REACTOR | [2021/35] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE DES EAUX USÉES AVEC COMMANDE DE LA CONCENTRATION DE COMPOSÉS SÉLECTIONNÉS DANS LE RÉACTEUR | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 20.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015083663 (KOMOR ANDREW T [US], et al); | [XI]US2016176741 (GAO DI [US]) | International search | [A]US5932085 (COWLEY GERALD [CA], et al); | [X]US2003127391 (CRAFT FRANK S [US], et al); | [A]US2010051542 (ELEKTOROWICZ MARIA [CA], et al); | [A]US2015266753 (FRAIM MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US2018086651 (LALLI JASON D [US]) | by applicant | US2003127391 | US2015083663 | US2016176741 |