EP3871684 - DRUG FOR TREATING AND/OR IMPROVING SEPTICEMIA ASSOCIATED WITH COAGULATION ABNORMALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Pharma Corporation 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUKI Osamu c/o ASAHI KASEI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA Kosuke c/o ASAHI KASEI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA Risa c/o ASAHI KASEI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [2024/26] |
Former [2021/35] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19875488.9 | 01.08.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019JP30133 | Priority number, date | US201862748706P | 22.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862748706 P | US201862771628P | 27.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862771628 P | US201962813352P | 04.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962813352 P | [2021/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020084853 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3871684 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3871684 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/36, A61P31/04 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
A61K38/366 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61P29/00 (KR);
A61P31/00 (US);
A61P31/04 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2021/35] | A61K38/00, A61P31/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND/ODER VERBESSERUNG DER SEPTIKÄMIE IN ZUSAMMENHANG MIT EINER GERINNUNGSSTÖRUNG | [2021/35] | English: | DRUG FOR TREATING AND/OR IMPROVING SEPTICEMIA ASSOCIATED WITH COAGULATION ABNORMALITY | [2021/35] | French: | MÉDICAMENT PERMETTANT DE TRAITER ET/OU D'ATTÉNUER LA SEPTICÉMIE ASSOCIÉE À UNE ANOMALIE DE COAGULATION | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2021 | Translation filed | 22.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 02.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2781221 (ASAHI KASEI PHARMA CORP [JP]); | International search | [YA]JP2008525110 ; | [XY]WO2013073545 (ASAHI KASEI PHARMA CORP [JP], et al); | [YA]JP2013520475 ; | [YA]WO2013168602 (MITSUBISHI CHEM MEDIENCE CORP [JP], et al); | [YA]JP2016513463 ; | by applicant | WO8809811 | JPS646219 | JPS6445398 | JPH02255699 | JPH0386900 | JPH03133380 | JPH03218399 | JPH03259084 | WO9200325 | WO9203149 | JPH04210700 | JPH0542920B | WO9315755 | JPH05213998 | JPH05310787 | JPH06205692 | JPH06321805 | JPH07155176 | JPH09110900 | JPH11341990 | WO03061687 | WO2013073545 |