EP3780322 - FLYING CAPACITOR CHARGING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Digital Power Technologies Co., Ltd. Office 01, 39th Floor, Block A Antuoshan Headquarters Towers 33 Antuoshan 6th Road Futian District Shenzhen, 518043 / CN | [2021/50] |
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Yiming Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19875633.0 | 17.09.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019CN106278 | Priority number, date | CN201811244229 | 24.10.2018 Original published format: CN201811244229 | [2021/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020082940 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3780322 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3780322 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/158, H02M3/07, H02J7/34 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
H02M3/158 (EP);
H02M3/1584 (US);
H01M10/44 (CN);
H02J7/345 (EP,US);
H02M3/1582 (CN);
H02M7/4837 (EP);
H02J2207/20 (EP);
H02M1/0095 (EP,US);
H02M3/07 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/20] | H02M3/158, H02J7/00, H02J7/34 | ||
Former IPC [2021/07] | H02J7/00, H01M10/44, H02M3/158 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM LADEN VON FLIEGENDEN KONDENSATOREN | [2023/33] | English: | FLYING CAPACITOR CHARGING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CHARGE DE CONDENSATEUR VOLANT | [2021/07] |
Former [2021/07] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM LADEN VON FLUGKONDENSATOREN | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2020 | Translation filed | 26.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 10.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2024 | BG | 14.02.2024 | ES | 14.02.2024 | FI | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | LT | 14.02.2024 | LV | 14.02.2024 | PL | 14.02.2024 | SE | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | PT | 14.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 14.02.2024 | |
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 14.02.2024 | |
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2009017783 (INTERSIL INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,8-10,12 * paragraphs [0022] - [0026] - [0033] - [0044]; figures 2,5 *; | [Y]CN104052278 (MAXIM INTEGRATED PRODUCTS) [Y] 6,13 * abstract *; | [Y]US2015244277 (WANGEMANN JOERG [DE], et al) [Y] 4,11* paragraph [0046]; figure 6 *; | [XYI]WO2018102689 (INTEGRATED DEVICE TECH [US]) [X] 1-3,5,8-10,12 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0027]; figure 2 * [Y] 4,6,11,13 [I] 7,14 |