EP3873512 - EPCAM ANTIBODIES, ACTIVATABLE ANTIBODIES, AND IMMUNOCONJUGATES, AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ImmunoGen, Inc. 830 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | For all designated states CytomX Therapeutics, Inc. 151 Oyster Point Blvd, Suite 400 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Yimao 11 Walnut Street Acton, MA 01720 / US | 02 /
HICKS, Stuart, W. 415 Massachusetts Avenue North Andover, MA 01845 / US | 03 /
GUIDI, Cynthia, J. 5 Richard Way Littleton, Massachusetts 01460 / US | 04 /
KOHLI, Neeraj 7 Wheaton Road Arlington, MA 02474 / US | 05 /
CHITTENDEN, Thomas 24 Walker Farm Road Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | 06 /
LAMBERT, John 19 Chalk Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 07 /
PAIDHUNGAT, Madan, M. C/o Cytomx Therapeutics, Inc. 151 Oyster Point Blvd. Suite 400 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 08 /
SAGERT, Jason, Gary C/o Cytomx Therapeutics, Inc. 151 Oyster Point Blvd. Suite 400 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 09 /
TIPTON, Kimberly, Ann C/o Cytomx Therapeutics, Inc. 151 Oyster Point Blvd. Suite 400 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 10 /
CHAN, Chanty, Mariategue C/o Cytomx Therapeutics, Inc. 151 Oyster Point Blvd. Suite 400 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 11 /
FOX, Ellaine Anne, Mariano C/o Cytomx Therapeutics, Inc. 151 Oyster Point Blvd. Suite 400 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/36] | Chapman, Desmond Mark Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19876033.2 | 23.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019US57569 | Priority number, date | US201862751530P | 26.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862751530 P | US201962824539P | 27.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962824539 P | US201962846297P | 10.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962846297 P | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020086665 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3873512 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/395, C07K16/28, C07K16/18, A61P35/00 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/30 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6801 (KR);
A61K47/68033 (EP,US);
A61K47/68035 (EP,US);
A61K47/6817 (KR);
A61K47/6849 (EP);
A61K47/6851 (EP);
A61K47/6857 (EP);
A61K47/6889 (KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP);
C07K2317/30 (EP);
C07K2317/33 (EP);
C07K2317/565 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | EPCAM-ANTIKÖRPER, AKTIVIERBARE ANTIKÖRPER UND IMMUNOKONJUGATE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2021/36] | English: | EPCAM ANTIBODIES, ACTIVATABLE ANTIBODIES, AND IMMUNOCONJUGATES, AND USES THEREOF | [2021/36] | French: | ANTICORPS EPCAM, ANTICORPS ACTIVABLES, ET IMMUNOCONJUGUÉS, ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2021/36] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 25.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP21203506.7 Application refused : 31.03.2022 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010115630 (FAULSTICH HEINZ [DE], et al); | [A]WO2012112687 (IMMUNOGEN INC [US], et al); | [T]WO2016145349 (VIVENTIA BIO INC [CA], et al) | International search | [A]US2010189651 (STAGLIANO NANCY E [US], et al); | [A]US2016024207 (HARVEY BARRETT R [US], et al); | [A]WO2017021540 (AGENCY SCIENCE TECH & RES [SG], et al); | [A]US2018171012 (SONODA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) | by applicant | US5208020 | US5225539 | US5585089 | WO9711971 | WO9823289 | US6277375 | US2002147311 | US6716821 | US6913748 | US2005169933 | US7083784 | US7217797 | US2007148167 | US2007148164 | WO2007106585 | US7276497 | US2008050310 | WO2009016516 | WO2009025846 | WO2009058492 | US7538195 | US2009274713 | US7666817 | WO2010033279 | WO2010043880 | US2010129314 | WO2010081173 | WO2010091150 | WO2010115630 | WO2011130616 | US8088376 | WO2012112708 | WO2012112687 | WO2012128868 | US8426402 | US8563269 | WO2013177481 | WO2014026136 | US8765740 | US2016082114 | US9353127 | US9381256 | WO2016179285 | US2017014522 |