EP3870563 - NOVEL ORGANOLEPTIC COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Flavors & Fragrances Inc. 1515 State Highway No.36 Union Beach, New Jersey 07735 / US | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NARULA, Anubhav P.S. INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC. 1515 State Highway 36 Union Beach, New Jersey 07735 / US | 02 /
WEISS, Richard A. INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC. 1515 State Highway 36 Union Beach, New Jersey 07735 / US | 03 /
DENUTTE, Hugo Robert Germain Temselaan 100 Strombeek-Bever 1853 Brussels / BE | 04 /
SMETS, Johan Temselaan 100 Strombeek-Bever 1853 Brussels / BE | 05 /
PORTER, Philip John One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 06 /
VRIELYNCK, Freek Annie Camiel Lijsterhoek 12 8730 Beernem / BE | 07 /
VAN AKEN, Koen Vijverhoek 68 8520 Kuurne / BE | 08 /
RUTTENS, Bart Antoon Judith Industrielaan 12 9800 Deinze / BE | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | International N&H EMEA Parallelvej 16 2800 Kongens Lyngby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2021/35] | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19876319.5 | 22.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019US57368 | Priority number, date | US201862749711P | 24.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862749711 P | [2021/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020086537 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3870563 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07C49/21, C07C33/14, A61K8/34, A61K8/35, A61Q13/00 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
C11B9/0034 (EP,US);
C07C33/14 (EP);
C07C49/21 (EP,US);
C07C2601/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE ORGANOLEPTISCHE VERBINDUNGEN | [2021/35] | English: | NOVEL ORGANOLEPTIC COMPOUNDS | [2021/35] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSÉS ORGANOLEPTIQUES | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 10.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2445649 (FIRMENICH & CIE) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-3 *; | [Y]JPS5424856 (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4229600 (KOBAYASHI TOYOHIKO, et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 2, lines 4-30; claims 1-3 *; | [IY]JP2013199450 (KAO CORP) [I] 1-15 * page 12, paragraphs 1-3; 88; figure 7; claims 1-3,5,6; compounds I-2, I-3 * * page 13, paragraph 94; figure 8; compound X * [Y] 1-15; | [A]WO2015148743 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-15 * pages 5-23; table 5 ** page 10; table 5; compounds 42-43 * | International search | [X]DE2445649 (FIRMENICH & CIE) [X] 1-15 * See example 10; claims 1-4. *; | [A]EP0045534 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]) [A] 1-15 * See the whole document. *; | [A]US2011217257 (BELKO ROBERT P [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See claims 1-12. *; | [A]WO2017070418 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-15 * See the whole document. *; | [A] - Walter M Lauer, Wujciak, Donald W, Marvell E N, Logan A V, L, Friedman, Ledeen R W, "The Phenylallyl Ether Rearrangement. The Allyl and Crotyl Ethers of 2,4-Dimethyl-6- propenylphenol", J. Org. Chem. This Journal Helv. Chim. Acta, (19560101), vol. 78, pages 5601 - 5606, XP055707709 [A] 1-15 * See the whole document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01602a038 | by applicant | US4534891 |