EP3871596 - BIOELECTRODE, BIOLOGICAL SENSOR, AND BIOLOGICAL SIGNAL MEASUREMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Bakelite Co.Ltd. 5-8, Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAZOE Katsuma c/o Sumitomo Bakelite Co., Ltd., 5-8, Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 02 /
YAGISAWA Takashi c/o Sumitomo Bakelite Co., Ltd., 5-8, Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 03 /
UENO Masaomi c/o Sumitomo Bakelite Co., Ltd., 5-8, Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 04 /
HARADA Takuya c/o Sumitomo Bakelite Co., Ltd., 5-8, Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2021/35] | Application number, filing date | 19876432.6 | 03.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019JP39170 | Priority number, date | JP20180202286 | 26.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018202286 | [2021/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020085034 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3871596 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/291 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
A61B5/291 (EP,US);
A61B5/268 (EP,US);
A61B5/265 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0209 (EP);
A61B2562/0215 (US);
A61B2562/125 (EP);
A61B2562/164 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/35] | A61B5/0408 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | BIOELEKTRODE, BIOLOGISCHER SENSOR UND BIOLOGISCHES SIGNALMESSSYSTEM | [2021/35] | English: | BIOELECTRODE, BIOLOGICAL SENSOR, AND BIOLOGICAL SIGNAL MEASUREMENT SYSTEM | [2021/35] | French: | BIOÉLECTRODE, CAPTEUR BIOLOGIQUE ET SYSTÈME DE MESURE DE SIGNAL BIOLOGIQUE | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2021 | Translation filed | 10.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 25.07.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [YA]JP2003225217 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [Y] 10-12, 14-17 * , paragraphs [0001], [0031]-[0035] (Family: none) * [A] 2, 13; | [YA]JP2013111361 (JAPAN HEALTH SCIENCE FOUND) [Y] 16-17 * , paragraphs [0001], [0019]-[0023], [0028], [0030], fig. 1-2, 4 & WO 2013/080992 A1 * [A] 2, 13; | [YA]JP2016016042 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [Y] 1, 3-12, 14-17 * , paragraphs [0041]-[0043], fig. 9 (Family: none) * [A] 2, 13; | [YA]JP2016163688 (NITTA KK) [Y] 1, 3-12, 14-17 * , paragraphs [0001], [0038]-[0041], [0050]-[0052], fig. 3-4 & WO 2016/136629 A1 * [A] 2, 13; | [A]JP2017074370 (NITTA KK) [A] 1-17* , entire text, all drawings & WO 2017/065196 A1 & CN 108135524 A *; | [YA]CN107374622 (UNIV SOUTH CHINA TECH) [Y] 1, 3-12, 14-17 * , paragraphs [0001], [0008]-[0010], [0016], [0025]-[0026], [0028], fig. 1-5 (Family: none) * [A] 2, 13 | by applicant | JP2016163688 | JP2018202286 |