EP3872958 - PHOTOVOLTAIC ELECTRICITY UTILIZATION DEVICE AND CHARGING CONTROL METHOD, APPARATUS AND CIRCUIT THEREFOR, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gree Electric Appliances, Inc. of Zhuhai West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Han West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Ningning West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Xuefen West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Keqin West Jinji Road Qianshan Zhuhai, Guangdong 519070 / CN | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2021/35] | Application number, filing date | 19876518.2 | 15.08.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019CN100798 | Priority number, date | CN201811240912 | 24.10.2018 Original published format: CN201811240912 | [2021/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020082860 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3872958 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/35, H02J3/34 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
H02J3/34 (EP);
H02J7/35 (CN,US);
H02J7/0029 (CN,US);
H02J7/0047 (US);
H02J7/007 (CN);
H02J7/00712 (US);
H02J7/0077 (CN);
H02J7/345 (US);
H02J2207/50 (EP,US);
Y02E10/56 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/35] | H02J7/35 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | PHOTOVOLTAISCHE ELEKTRIZITÄTSNUTZUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND LADESTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SCHALTUNG DAFÜR UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/35] | English: | PHOTOVOLTAIC ELECTRICITY UTILIZATION DEVICE AND CHARGING CONTROL METHOD, APPARATUS AND CIRCUIT THEREFOR, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'UTILISATION D'ÉLECTRICITÉ PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CHARGE, APPAREIL ET CIRCUIT ASSOCIÉS, ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2021 | Translation filed | 30.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 02.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |