EP3872785 - VIBRATION GENERATING DEVICE, AND VIBRATION GENERATING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faurecia Clarion Electronics Co., Ltd. 7-2, Shintoshin, Chuo-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 330-0081 / JP | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIKAWA Takao c/o Faurecia Clarion Electronics Co., Ltd. 7-2, Shintoshin, Chuo-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 330-0081 / JP | 02 /
NOGUCHI Kazuo c/o TACHI-S CO., LTD., 3-3-7, Matsubara-cho Akishima-shi, Tokyo 196-8611 / JP | 03 /
FUJITA Daisuke c/o TACHI-S CO., LTD., 3-3-7, Matsubara-cho Akishima-shi, Tokyo 196-8611 / JP | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2021/35] | Application number, filing date | 19876884.8 | 17.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019JP40935 | Priority number, date | JP20180198147 | 22.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018198147 | [2021/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020085202 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3872785 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16, A47C7/62, B60N2/90, B60W50/16, G08B6/00 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
G08B6/00 (EP);
B60N2002/981 (EP);
B60W50/16 (EP);
G08B21/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/35] | G08G1/16, A47C7/62, B60N2/90 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | SCHWINGUNGSERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SCHWINGUNGSERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/35] | English: | VIBRATION GENERATING DEVICE, AND VIBRATION GENERATING METHOD | [2021/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION DE VIBRATIONS ET PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION DE VIBRATIONS | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2021 | Translation filed | 17.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 16.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]JP2008001285 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [I] 1,4-8,11-14 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0094] * [A] 2,3,9,10; | [I]JP2008077631 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [I] 1,4-8,11-14 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0103] *; | [A]JP2009031946 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0068] *; | [I]US2009295558 (KAMEYAMA SHOGO [JP]) [I] 1,8 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0041] *; | [A]JP2013166534 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0013] ** paragraph [0014] *; | [I]US2015328985 (KIM SUNGHYUN [KR], et al) [I] 1,4-8,11-14 * paragraph [0567] - paragraph [0569] * * paragraph [0617] - paragraph [0620] *; | [A]US2018170255 (HASHIMOTO TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0070] * | International search | [A]JP2007304705 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-14 * , *; | [A]JP2008001285 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [A] 1-14 * , *; | [A]JP2017095017 (CLARION CO LTD) [A] 1-14* , *; | [A]JP2017134688 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-14 * , * | by applicant | JP2009120015 |