EP3870254 - ULTRA-LOW WASTE NEEDLE AND SYRINGE SYSTEM THAT AUTOMATICALLY AND PASSIVELY RENDERS A NEEDLE SAFE DURING THE INJECTION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharps Technology, Inc. 105 Maxess Road, Suite 124 Melville, NY 11747 / US | [2022/12] |
Former [2021/35] | For all designated states Sharps Technology Inc. One Penn Plaza, 36th Floor New York, NY 10119 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERLER, Barry 1291 Mettler Road Huntingdon Valley, PA 19006 / US | 02 /
MULONE, JR., Anthony, F. 275 Olde Homestead Drive Marstons Mills, MA 02648 / US | 03 /
CORELY, Kevin 27 Crestview Road Waltham, MA 02451 / US | 04 /
YAARI, Niv Poleg 144 Rosh Haayin / IL | 05 /
KATZ, Gil Avtalyon 105 2017600 Avtalyon / IL | 06 /
UDOVICH, Gregory Haviva Raih 56 32542 Haifa / IL | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | White, Jonathan Patrick JP White Intellectual Property Limited 25-27 Fitzwilliam Hall Fitzwilliam Place Dublin 2, D02 T292 / IE | [2021/35] | Application number, filing date | 19877448.1 | 24.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019US57970 | Priority number, date | US201862750803P | 25.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862750803 P | US201916660796 | 22.10.2019 Original published format: US201916660796 | [2021/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020086919 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3870254 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/178, A61M5/24, A61M5/31, A61M5/315, A61M5/32, A61M5/34, A61M5/50 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
A61M5/326 (EP,IL,KR);
A61M5/3129 (IL,KR,US);
A61M5/3269 (IL,KR,US);
A61M5/3257 (IL,KR);
A61M5/345 (IL,KR);
A61M2005/2073 (IL,KR,US);
A61M2005/31516 (EP,IL,KR);
A61M2005/3258 (IL,KR);
A61M2005/3265 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | NADEL UND SPRITZENSYSTEM MIT SEHR GERINGEM ABFALL, DAS EINE NADEL WÄHREND DES INJEKTIONSPROZESSES AUTOMATISCH UND PASSIV MACHT | [2021/35] | English: | ULTRA-LOW WASTE NEEDLE AND SYRINGE SYSTEM THAT AUTOMATICALLY AND PASSIVELY RENDERS A NEEDLE SAFE DURING THE INJECTION PROCESS | [2021/35] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SERINGUE ET AIGUILLE PRODUISANT PEU DE DÉCHETS, SÉCURISANT AUTOMATIQUEMENT ET PASSIVEMENT UNE AIGUILLE PENDANT LE PROCESSUS D'INJECTION | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 21.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5460611 (ALEXANDER GARY E [US]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [XI]US2004162530 (KIRK KEVIN F [US]) [X] 1-4,6-10,12,13 * figures 1-20 * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0067] * [I] 5,11; | [XI]US2008009808 (BERLER BARRY B [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,9,10,12,13 * figures 1-25 * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0061] * [I] 2,5,8,11 | International search | [XY]US2008009808 (BERLER BARRY B [US]) [X] 1-4, 7-10, 13-17 * entire document * [Y] 5, 11, 18; | [A]US2008097337 (JUDD DAMIEN [AU], et al) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [Y]US2008319346 (CRAWFORD JAMIESON [US], et al) [Y] 5, 11, 18 * entire document *; | [A]US2016367764 (DOYLE MARK CHRISTOPHER [US]) [A] 1-18* entire document *; | [A]US2017319791 (GIAMBATTISTA LUCIO [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * entire document * | by applicant | US2004162530 | US2008009808 |