EP3745506 - LITHIUM ELECTRODE AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states LG Energy Solution Ltd. Tower 1, 108 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu 07335 Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2020/49] | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Eunkyung LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
JANG, Minchul LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Bora LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
YOUN, Suk Il LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
SON, Byoungkuk LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/49] | Application number, filing date | 19877644.5 | 31.10.2019 | [2020/49] | WO2019KR14641 | Priority number, date | KR20180131652 | 31.10.2018 Original published format: KR 20180131652 | [2020/49] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020091479 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3745506 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3745506 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/134, H01M4/62, H01M10/42, H01M10/052, // H01M4/38 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
H01M4/382 (EP);
H01M4/134 (EP,KR);
H01M10/0565 (US);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M10/4235 (KR);
H01M4/62 (EP,KR);
H01M4/624 (EP,KR);
H01M4/626 (EP,US);
H01M2220/20 (US);
H01M2300/0022 (US);
H01M2300/0082 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/49] | H01M4/134, H01M4/62, H01M10/42, H01M10/052 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LITHIUMELEKTRODE UND LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE DAMIT | [2020/49] | English: | LITHIUM ELECTRODE AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME | [2020/49] | French: | ÉLECTRODE AU LITHIUM ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM LA COMPRENANT | [2020/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2020 | Translation filed | 27.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 25.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2019 | AL | 20.07.2022 | AT | 20.07.2022 | BG | 20.07.2022 | CY | 20.07.2022 | CZ | 20.07.2022 | DK | 20.07.2022 | EE | 20.07.2022 | FI | 20.07.2022 | HR | 20.07.2022 | IT | 20.07.2022 | LT | 20.07.2022 | LV | 20.07.2022 | MC | 20.07.2022 | MK | 20.07.2022 | MT | 20.07.2022 | NL | 20.07.2022 | RO | 20.07.2022 | RS | 20.07.2022 | SI | 20.07.2022 | SK | 20.07.2022 | SM | 20.07.2022 | NO | 20.10.2022 | GR | 21.10.2022 | BE | 31.10.2022 | CH | 31.10.2022 | IE | 31.10.2022 | LI | 31.10.2022 | LU | 31.10.2022 | IS | 20.11.2022 | PT | 21.11.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 31.10.2019 | |
AL | 20.07.2022 | ||
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
CY | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
IT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
MK | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
IE | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
LU | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 31.10.2019 | |
AL | 20.07.2022 | ||
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CY | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
IT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
MK | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
IE | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
LU | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 31.10.2019 | |
AL | 20.07.2022 | ||
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CY | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
IT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
IE | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
LU | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HU | 31.10.2019 | |
AL | 20.07.2022 | ||
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CY | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
IE | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
LU | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CY | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
IE | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
LU | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
IE | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
LU | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
LU | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SI | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
LU | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
LU | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
LU | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
AT | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 20.07.2022 | |
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 20.07.2022 | |
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 20.07.2022 | |
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
DK | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 20.07.2022 | |
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 20.07.2022 | |
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 20.07.2022 | |
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 20.07.2022 | |
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
PT | 21.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 20.07.2022 | |
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
NL | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 20.07.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1407505 (MOLTECH CORP [US]) [X] 1,7-10 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0073] - [0077] * [I] 2-6; | [XI]US2007221265 (AFFINITO JOHN D [US], et al) [X] 1,7-10 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0110] - [0113] - [0117] - [0122] * [I] 2-6; | [E]EP3675244 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [E] 1-10 * figure 1 * * claims 1-14 ** paragraphs [0038] - [0045] * | International search | [Y]KR20140006639 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-10; | [Y]JPS5241060B (INSTITUT NATIONAL POLYTECHNIQUE DE GRENOBLE) [Y] 1-10 * . *; | [Y]KR20170099375 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-10; | [A]KR100542213B [A] 1-10; | [A]KR20180019822 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 | by applicant | KR20180131652 | KR20190137931 | KR20180032168 | KR20180036564 |